Milner v. Chambless Math & Carr, P.C.
Plaintiff: Christopher Milner
Defendant: Chambless Math & Carr, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00700
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stott, Joseph)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chambless Math & Carr, P.C.. (Stott, Joseph)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/6/18. (djy, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chambless Math & Carr, P.C.. (Stott, Joseph)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chambless Math & Carr, P.C..(Stott, Joseph)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Yitzchak Zelman on behalf of Christopher Milner (Zelman, Yitzchak)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Yitzchak Zelman Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/24/18. (djy, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 Motion for Yitzchak Zelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602050427.) by Christopher Milner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 certificate of good standing, #3 fee receipt, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(djy, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Connie Butts for Chambless Math & Carr, P.C. served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (djy, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Milner re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Schoen, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Christopher Milner Corporate Disclosures due by 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Christopher Milner. (djy, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chambless Math & Carr, P.C. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
July 31, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christopher Milner. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry 1]). (djy, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Chambless Math & Carr, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050164.), filed by Christopher Milner. (Attachments: #1 supporting document, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 fee receipt)(djy, ) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milner v. Chambless Math & Carr, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Milner
Represented By: David I. Schoen
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chambless Math & Carr, P.C.
Represented By: Joseph Elliott Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?