Murphy v. SES of Montgomery, LLC et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Rodney J. Murphy
Defendant: William R. Hudson, II, SES of Montgomery, LLC, Subway and Beatrice Smith
Case Number: 2:2018cv00815
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/26/2018. (wcl, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rodney J. Murphy. (djy, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodney J. Murphy. (Attachments: #1 application to proceed)(djy, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William R. Hudson, II, SES of Montgomery, LLC, Beatrice Smith, Subway, filed by Rodney J. Murphy. (Attachments: #1 application, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 civil cover sheet)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. SES of Montgomery, LLC et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Hudson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SES of Montgomery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatrice Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?