Houston v. Davenport et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Kenneth Houston
Defendant: Clevon Randolph, Carter Davenport, Eddie Cook and Lynn Head
Case Number: 2:2018cv00872
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON MOTIONS denying #19 Motion to hold in abeyance and Motion for Verification of Counsel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/21/18. (djy, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 Amended Complaint, #16 Amendment, & #17 Order signed by Kristi Simpson for Carter Davenport served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (alm, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Temporary Abeyance and MOTION for Verification of Counsel by the Defendant by Kenneth Houston. (alm, ).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 amended complaint, #16 amendment to complaint, & #17 order of procedure signed by (illegible) for Eddie Cook served on (no date given), answer due 12/18/2018. (djy, ).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on ore before 12/18/2018; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #10 amended complaint & #16 amendment to the Dfts, General Counsel for the AL DOC, & General Counsel for the AL Board of Pardons & Paroles. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/6/2018. (alm, )
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, filed by Kenneth Houston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(alm, )
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #12 Order signed by Kristi Simpson for AL DOC Interim General Counsel served on 10/31/2018. (alm, )
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Response to Order re #12 Order, by Gary Lee Willford, Jr. (Willford, Gary)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 11/6/2018, the plf shall file an amendment to his #10 amended complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/26/2018. (alm, )
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 11/6/2018, Interim General Counsel for the AL DOC shall (i) provide the court with the last known address they have on record for Carter Davenport, OR (ii) advise the Court of whether Interim General Counsel or his designee will accept service and provide representation for this dft; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this order via certified mail to Interim General Counsel for the AL DOC. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/26/2018. (Copy mailed CMRRR to AL DOC Interim General Counsel as directed)(alm, )
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: the court finds it appropriate to allow the #10 amended complaint to proceed on the claims presented therein seeking expungement of his disciplinary and scheduling of a new parole consideration hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/26/2018. (alm, )
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Eddie Cook, Carter Davenport, Lynn Head, filed by Kenneth Houston.(alm, )
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Response to Order re #8 Order, by Kenneth Houston. (alm, )
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 10/29/2018, the plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file complaints, and the plf shall utilize this form in filing his amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/11/2018. (Copy of inmate 1983 complaint form mailed to Plf as directed)(alm, )
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Donaldson CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/11/2018. (Furnished: Cashier via email on 11/6/18) (alm, ) Modified on 11/6/2018 (alm, ).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred in from Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 2:18-cv-1448-ACA-JEO; Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. Davenport et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clevon Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?