Cook v. Brunson-Nichols Construction Co.
Plaintiff: Donald Cook, Jr.
Defendant: Brunson-Nichols Construction Co.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00892
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading or Motion; Brunson-Nichols Construction Co. answer due 12/14/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 11/14/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Brunson-Nichols Construction Co.. (alm, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Brunson-Nichols Construction Co.. (Jackson, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading or Motion by Brunson-Nichols Construction Co.. (Jackson, Michael)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Amy Nichols for Brunson-Nichols Construction Co. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (alm, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donald Cook, Jr re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Brashaw, William) Modified on 10/23/2018 to add the link to the #3 Notice (alm, ).
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brunson-Nichols Construction Co.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Donald Cook, Jr.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Donald Cook, Jr.. (alm, )
October 18, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Donald Cook, Jr. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brunson-Nichols Construction Co. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602051082.), filed by Donald Cook, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Brunson-Nichols Construction Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunson-Nichols Construction Co.
Represented By: Michael Leon Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cook, Jr.
Represented By: David Jeremy Schatz
Represented By: William Channing Brashaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?