Knox v. Pattel et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Mark Knox
Defendant: Dr. Pattel, The Birmingham Veteran's Administration, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Central Alabama Health Care System, United States Department of Veterans Affairs Central Alabama Healthcare System and Veterans Affairs Department Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv00946
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
2 Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dr. Pattel, United States Department of Veterans Affairs Central Alabama Healthcare System, Veterans Affairs Department Medical Center, Central Alabama Health Care System, filed by Mark Knox. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(kh, )
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the court has referred this matter to PSAP; it is ORDERED that on or before 12/20/2018, Knox shall file an amended complaint with assistance from an attorney provided through PSAP; further ORDERED that service of the complaint is STAYED pending the filing of Knox's amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 11/29/2018. (wcl, )
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case be and is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Gray Borden for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/8/2018. (kh, )
November 6, 2018 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (kh, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of the pro se party by Mark Knox. (kh, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 INFORMATION of the pro se party by Mark Knox. (kh, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mark Knox. (kh, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Knox. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(kh, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Pattel, The Birmingham Veteran's Administration, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, filed by Mark Knox.(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Pattel et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pattel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Birmingham Veteran's Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Alabama Health Care System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs Central Alabama Healthcare System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Affairs Department Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?