Shannon v. Woods (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Otis Shannon
Defendant: Anthony Cotton, United States Air Force, Walter Woods, B. Briggs, Chief Psychologist Dodd, Unit Manager Fleiner, S. Wiggins and Case Manager Mathews
Case Number: 2:2018cv00962
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Request to File Preliminary Injunction by Otis Shannon. (alm, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #8 Petition, #9 Memorandum, & #10 Order signed by Emily Sase for U.S. Attorney General served on 12/13/2018.(alm, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time; Respondent is GRANTED an extension from 1/4/2019, to and including 2/19/2019, to file his answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/18/2018. (alm, )
December 18, 2018 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Walter Woods. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Walter Woods. (Doyle, Stephen)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 First MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Response by Walter Woods. (Doyle, Stephen)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #8 Petition, #9 Memorandum, & #10 Order signed by Lawrence B. for U.S. Attorney's Office served on 12/10/2018, answer due for Walter Woods on 1/4/2019. (alm, ) Modified on 12/13/2018 to reflect the answer due date as 1/4/19 & not 1/4/18 (alm, ).
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, petition, #9 memo, and #10 order signed by R. Cobb for Walter Woods served on 12/10/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (djy, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Walter Woods, U.S. Attorney, & U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with copy of #8 Amended Petition, #9 Memorandum, & #10 Order. (alm, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 1/4/2019; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/ summons, #8 petition, & #9 memorandum to Warden Walter Woods, U.S. Attorney, & U.S. Attorney General. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/7/2018. (alm, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Otis Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(alm, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Otis Shannon. (alm, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Error re #6 MOTION (Request) for Writ of Mandamus, which is hereby STRICKEN as a clerical error. (alm, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #7 NOTICE) MOTION (Request) for Writ of Mandamus by Otis Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(alm, ) Modified on 11/27/2018 (alm, ).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 12/11/2018, Shannon shall file an amended 28 USC 2241 petition regarding his challenge to RCC placement, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish Petitioner with a form for use in filing a petition under 28 USC 2241. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/26/2018. (Copy of 2241 form mailed to Petitioner as directed) (alm, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 4602051466. (alm, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or 11/30/2018, Petitioner shall file either the $5.00 filing fee or an affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish Petitioner with a form for use in requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/16/2018. (Copy of IFP form mailed as directed) (Furnished: Cashier)(alm, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Otis Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(beh, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Otis Shannon.( No Filing Fee; No IFP) (beh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2018 to attach a certificate of service filed by the Petitioner on 11/27/18: #1 Certificate of Service) (alm, ). Modified on 11/27/2018 (alm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. Woods (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Woods
Represented By: Stephen Michael Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Psychologist Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager Fleiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Manager Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?