Isenhower v. Roll Tide Recovery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Isenhower
Defendant: Titlemax of Alabama, Inc. and Roll Tide Recovery, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00965
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER construing #8 motion to dismiss as a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice, and which comports with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) ; ORDERING directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/13/18. (djy, )
December 12, 2018 Motion to dismiss construed as a NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Isenhower pursuant to #9 order (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #8 ). (djy, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by John Isenhower. (Seals, Wallace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Allison Brinkley for Roll Tide Recovery, LLC served on (no date given), answer due 12/19/2018. (djy, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Titlemax of Alabama, Inc. served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (djy, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Crad Hubbard on behalf of John Isenhower (Hubbard, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Roll Tide Recovery, LLC, Titlemax of Alabama, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint and disclosure statement to defendants. (djy, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) John Isenhower. (djy, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Isenhower. (djy, )
November 15, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Isenhower. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roll Tide Recovery, LLC, Titlemax of Alabama, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051446.), filed by John Isenhower. (Attachments: #1 request for service by certified mail, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isenhower v. Roll Tide Recovery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titlemax of Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roll Tide Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Isenhower
Represented By: Wallace Whitney Seals
Represented By: John Crad Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?