Holmes v. Mobile Work Release (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Arthur Wade Holmes
Defendant: Mobile Work Release
Case Number: 2:2018cv00978
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Received email from ALSD regarding receipt of e-transfer case; ALSD case number assigned as 1:19-cv-11. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
January 8, 2019 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) The #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama; 3) The #2 application to proceed without prepayment of fees is left for resolution after transfer; DIRECTING the Clerk to take the appropriate steps to effectuate the transfer of this case; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/8/2019. (wcl, )
December 21, 2018 NO OBJECTIONS filed to #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Objections to R&R due by 12/10/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/26/2018. (dmn, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Arthur Wade Holmes. (beh, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Mobile Work Release, filed by Arthur Wade Holmes.(beh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Mobile Work Release (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Work Release
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Wade Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?