Smith v. Diversicare Leasing Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Roy Earl Smith
Defendant: Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Co., Inc. and Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00979
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harrison, Alicia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins as Presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (alm, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 1/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/21/2018. (alm, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 Supplemental Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC. (Harrison, Alicia)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC, Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Co., Inc..(Harrison, Alicia) Modified on 11/27/2018 to add as also filed on behalf of Dft Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC (alm, ).
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES.(alm, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Co., Inc., & Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC. (alm, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Co., Inc., & Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(alm, )
November 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Roy Earl Smith. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf) (alm, )
November 20, 2018 COMPLAINT against Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Co., Inc., Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC, filed by Roy Earl Smith. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf)(alm, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diversicare Leasing Corp., Diversicare Management Services Co., Inc., Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2018-901928.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602051484) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt) (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Diversicare Leasing Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversicare Leasing Corp.
Represented By: Alicia Medders Harrison
Represented By: Reed Robertson Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversicare Management Services Co., Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Medders Harrison
Represented By: Reed Robertson Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC
Represented By: Alicia Medders Harrison
Represented By: Reed Robertson Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Earl Smith
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?