Johnson v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Johnson
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North American, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Alabama, Inc. and Terry Edward Crawford
Case Number: 2:2018cv00997
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North American, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Brown, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2019 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #1 Main Document (Redacted)) (alm, ). Modified on 1/25/2019 (alm, ).
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Affidavit of A.J. by Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North American, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Brown, David) Modified on 1/23/2019 to add the link to the #11 motion (wcl, ).
January 10, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEFING ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #11 MOTION to Remand be submitted without oral argument on 1/30/2019; further ORDERED that the dfts file a response, which shall include a brief, on or before 1/23/2019; Plf may file a reply brief on or before 1/30/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/2/2019. (wcl, )
December 28, 2018 ***PURSUANT TO THE #11 MOTION - Attorney Benjamin Woodforde Maxymuk for Brenda Johnson added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brenda Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of A.J.)(Wilson, Frank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2018 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #2 Main Document (Redacted), #3 Exhibit A - Affidavit of A.J. (Redacted)) (wcl, ). Modified on 12/28/2018 to remove the erroneous duplicate MOTION to Remand from the docket text (wcl, ).
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Alabama, Inc. re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Brown, David)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Alabama, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment) (wcl, )
December 5, 2018 ***PURSUANT TO THE #8 ANSWER - Attorney Emily Slay Walters for Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Alabama, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Alabama, Inc..(Brown, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Toyota Motor North American, Inc..(Brown, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc..(Brown, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Brown, David)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (wcl, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (wcl, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor North American, Inc.. (wcl, )
November 28, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North American, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
November 28, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brenda Johnson. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
November 28, 2018 COMPLAINT against Terry Edward Crawford, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Alabama, Inc., Toyota Motor North American, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., filed by Brenda Johnson. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North American, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. from Circuit Court of Bullock County, Alabama, case number 09-cv-18-900061.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051538) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Slay Walters
Represented By: David Lee Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North American, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Slay Walters
Represented By: David Lee Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Represented By: Emily Slay Walters
Represented By: David Lee Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Emily Slay Walters
Represented By: David Lee Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Slay Walters
Represented By: David Lee Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Edward Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Johnson
Represented By: Walter Edgar McGowan
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Dickson, II
Represented By: Frank Moseley Wilson
Represented By: Lynn Wilson Jinks, III
Represented By: Benjamin Woodforde Maxymuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?