United States of America v. Williams (MAG2)

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert M. Williams
Case Number: 2:2018mc03834
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/15/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry)(wcl, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service by United States of America. (Doyle, Stephen)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (Doyle, Stephen)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing that respondent, Robert M. Williams, shall appear before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/11/2018 @ 02:00 PM, in Courtroom 5B, FMJ Courthouse Complex, Montgomery, Alabama 36104, to show cause why he should not be compelled to comply with the Internal Revenue Service summons served upon him on 9/21/2017; further ORDERING that a copy of this order, together with the Petition and Exhibits thereto, shall be personally served on Robert M. Williams by an official of the Internal Revenue Service within 30 days of the date of this Order. The United States shall file proof of service into the record of these proceedings on or before 10/12/2018; further ORDERING that, on or before 10/24/2018, the respondent shall file and serve a written response to the Petition supported by appropriate affidavits, as well as any motions the respondent desires to make, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/12/18. (djy, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Susan Russ Walker for determination of the #1 Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons and entry of any orders or other recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/10/2018. (alm, )
September 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Referral Judge. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Williams (MAG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen Michael Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?