Synovus Bank v. Hamilton
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank and Sterling Bank
Defendant: Susan Michelle Hamilton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00068
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 ALIAS Summons issued as to Susan Michelle Hamilton & returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (alm, )
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Synovus Bank. (Haithcock, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Susan Michelle Hamilton. (dmn, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Synovus Bank. (dmn, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Susan Michelle Hamilton ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052134.), filed by Synovus Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: James Hastings Haithcock, III
Represented By: Anna Whitney Akers
Represented By: William Jacob Long, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Bank
Represented By: James Hastings Haithcock, III
Represented By: Anna Whitney Akers
Represented By: William Jacob Long, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Michelle Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?