Libertarian Party of Alabama v. Merrill
Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of Alabama
Defendant: John Harold Merrill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00069
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Harold Merrill. (Messick, Misty)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Libertarian Party of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Unpublished decision, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Unpublished decision (excerpt), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Unpublished decision, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Unpublished decision)(Schoen, David)
February 19, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #5 MOTION - ***Attorney Winfield James Sinclair for John Harold Merrill added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Harold Merrill. (Messick, Misty)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Harold Merrill. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration of Clay S. Helms))(Messick, Misty)
January 29, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Libertarian Party of Alabama; John Harold Merrill & U.S. Attorney General served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #4 for pdf) (alm, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on John H. Merrill; Steve Marshall on January 28, 2019, filed by Libertarian Party of Alabama. (Schoen, David)
January 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Harold Merrill & Steven Marshall (Attorney General for the State of Alabama) and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (alm, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Libertarian Party of Alabama. (alm, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Harold Merrill (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602052139), filed by Libertarian Party of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/25/2019 to attach a corrected receipt) (alm, ). Modified on 1/25/2019 (alm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Libertarian Party of Alabama v. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libertarian Party of Alabama
Represented By: David I. Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harold Merrill
Represented By: Misty Shawn Fairbanks Messick
Represented By: Winfield James Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?