McInnes v. The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gavin McInnes
Defendant: The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00098
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Woodforde Maxymuk on behalf of The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Maxymuk, Benjamin)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.. (Holliday, Shannon)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Ronald D. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/25/2019. (dmn, )(NO PDF)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Lauren X. Topelsohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/25/2019. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for Ronald D. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602052455.) by Gavin McInnes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee)(dmn, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Lauren X. Topelsohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602052456.) by Gavin McInnes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee)(dmn, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency re: Pro Hac Vice Admission to Attorney Lauren X. Topelsohn. (dmn, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency re: Pro Hac Vice Admission to Attorney Ronald D. Coleman. (dmn, )
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's motion to continue (doc. no. #5 ) and plaintiff's response (doc. no. #7 ), it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and defendant is allowed until 4/6/2019, to file a response in this case. Answer due from The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. on 4/6/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/21/2019. (dmn, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Gavin McInnes. (Coleman, George)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the #5 Motion to Continue the Deadline for Filing a Response to the Complaint should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/15/2019. (dmn, )
February 14, 2019 ***Attorney Robert David Segall added for The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (dmn, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing Response to Complaint by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (Holliday, Shannon)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by name illegible for The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (dmn, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gavin McInnes. (djy, )
February 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gavin McInnes. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052254.), filed by Gavin McInnes. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McInnes v. The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin McInnes
Represented By: Ronald D. Coleman
Represented By: Lauren X. Topelsohn
Represented By: George Baron Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Woodforde Maxymuk
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?