Ford v. Pike Electric, LLC
Plaintiff: Alicia McDaniel Ford
Defendant: Pike Corporation and Pike Electric, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00146
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: (1) The #17 joint motion to continue deadlines is granted as set forth below; (2) The #7 uniform scheduling order is modified in the following respects: (A) The deadline for filing dispositive and Daubert motions is extended from 5/1/2020, to 7/30/2020; (B) The deadline for completing discovery is extended from 4/3/2020, to 7/2/2020; (C) The deadline for the parties' settlement conference is extended from 4/3/2020, to 7/2/2020; (D) The deadline for plf's expert reports is extended to 5/1/2020, for dft's is extended to 6/1/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/26/2020. (wcl, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadlines by Alicia McDaniel Ford, Pike Electric, LLC. (Heninger, Erik) Modified on 3/26/2020 to clarify the docket text and to add the dft as a filer (wcl, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Pike Electric, LLC, filed by Alicia McDaniel Ford.(Heninger, Erik) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct the docket text to reflect the correct dft name and to reflect a Jury Demand (wcl, ).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that the #13 motion is GRANTED and that the parties and all interested non-parties shall be governed as follows, as futher set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/7/2019. (kh, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that plaintiff shall have leave of court to file an amended complaint in compliance with the Local Rule 15.1 within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/7/2019. (kh, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Pike Corporation Alicia McDaniel Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shirley, Sean) Modified on 6/7/2019 to add as filed on behalf of the plaintiff (kh, ).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Entry of Protective Order, as further set out in order; Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to hold not later than 7 days from the date of this order, the required good faith conference. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/30/2019. (wcl, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Protective Order by Pike Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shirley, Sean)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amendment to Complaint by Pike Corporation.(Shirley, Sean)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT Naming Proper Party Defendant against Pike Corporation, filed by Alicia McDaniel Ford.(Heninger, Erik)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Pike Corporation.(Jones, Irving)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020, in Montgomery, Alabama, before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 5/1/2020; Mediation Notice due by 4/10/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 7/25/2019; Discovery due by 4/3/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/9/2019. (furn: calendar, ag)(kh, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Irving)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Pike Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Guy Hunter)(Shirley, Sean)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is therefore the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the removing defendant has until April 29, 2019, to amend the notice of removal to allege jurisdiction sufficiently, see 28 U.S.C. 1653; otherwise this lawsuit shall be remanded to state court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/15/2019. (kh, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Pike Corporation. (Shirley, Sean)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alicia McDaniel Ford. (Heninger, Erik)
February 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alicia McDaniel Ford. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
February 25, 2019 COMPLAINT against Pike Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4802052488.), filed by Alicia McDaniel Ford.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pike Corporation from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number CV-2019-900251.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4802052488) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Pike Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia McDaniel Ford
Represented By: Erik Stephen Heninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike Corporation
Represented By: Sean William Shirley
Represented By: Irving W Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike Electric, LLC
Represented By: Sean William Shirley
Represented By: Irving W Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?