Alegion, Inc. v. Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund

Appellee: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Appellant: Alegion, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00218
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Correction re #16 Reply Brief, to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the Presiding Judge's initials in the case number as "ALB" and not "MHT". (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #16 )(alm, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF re #13 Appellee's Brief filed by Alegion, Inc.. (Fritz, Michael) (Main Document 16 replaced on 6/17/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the Presiding Judge's initials in the case number as "ALB" and not "MHT") (alm, ). Modified on 6/17/2019 (alm, ).
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Transcripts re #2 Appellant's Designation which was filed with the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of 11/27/2018 Hearing, #2 USBC Docket Sheet 18-30912)(alm, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Error re #12 Appellee's Brief, which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous duplicate docket entry; See doc #13 for correct entry.(alm, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 Appellee's BRIEF by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund. Appellant Reply Brief due by 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Brief of Appellee)(Yu, Lois)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #14 NOTICE) Appellee's BRIEF by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund. Appellant Reply Brief due by 6/11/2019. (Yu, Lois) Modified on 5/29/2019 (alm, ).
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Transcripts re #2 Appellant's Designation which was filed with the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of 8/14/2018 (Afternoon) Hearing, #2 USBC Docket Sheet 18-30912)(alm, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Transcripts re: #2 appellant's Designation which was filed with US Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Transcript of 8/14/2018 Hearing, #2 Transcript of 3/18/2019 Debtor's objection to claim, #3 USBC Docket Sheet 18-30912)(djy, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher as Presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case. (alm, )
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Charles H. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/6/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Lois J. Yu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/6/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Charles H. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 4602053379) filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(alm, )
April 29, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #6 MOTION - ***Attorney Charles H. Lee for Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Lois J. Yu to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 4602053378) filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(alm, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Alegion, Inc.. Appellee Brief due by 5/28/2019. (Fritz, Michael)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellee's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal which was filed with U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal, #2 Doc. 108 - Response by Central States to Objection to Claim # 5, #3 Doc. 110 - Notice of Telephone Hearing Set, #4 Doc. 119 - Scheduling Order, #5 Doc. 147 - Notice of Telephone Hearing Set, #6 Doc. 155 - Notice of Central States Intent to File a Brief in Support of Its Position, #7 Certified Docket Sheet - BK 18-30912)(alm, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellant's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal which was filed with U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal, #2 Doc. 186 - Order Overruling Objection to Claim, #3 Doc. 182 - Notice of Telephone Hearing Set, #4 Doc. 157 - Brief in Support of Central States' Position, #5 Doc. 153 - Order, #6 Doc. 152 - Brief in Response to Creditor's Motion to Bifurcate, #7 Doc. 146 - Motion to Bifurcate, or, for an Extension, #8 Doc. 121 - Joint Stipulation of Facts., #9 Doc. 129 - Notice of Defense to Creditor's Response to Debtor's Objection to Claim, #10 Doc. 73 - Objection to Claim #5, #11 Proof of Claim 5-1, #12 Certified Docket Sheet - BK 18-30912)(alm, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 Bankrupty Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT; Bankruptcy Court case number 18-30912; Appellant Brief due by 4/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 USBC Notice of Appeal, #2 USBC Order, #3 USBC Certified Docket Sheet) (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alegion, Inc. v. Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Represented By: Lois J. Yu
Represented By: Charles H Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alegion, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Aaron Fritz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?