Moore v. Automotive Finance Corporation
Appellee: Automotive Finance Corporation
Appellant: Ray Moore
Case Number: 2:2019cv00223
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Ray Moore. (Bush, Anthony)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Appellee's BRIEF by Automotive Finance Corporation. (Williams, Richard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ray Moore. (Bush, Anthony) Modified on 5/29/2019 to clarify text to reflect as satisfying #6 Notice of Deficiency. (cnw, ).
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ray Moore; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF by Ray Moore. Appellee Brief due by 6/14/2019. (Bush, Anthony)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher as presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Automotive Finance Corporation. (Williams, Richard)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Copy of Appellant's Designation of Record on appeal which was filed with US Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal, #2 DE 1- Adversary Complaint, #3 DE 7- Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, #4 DE 8- Brief, #5 DE 11- Response, #6 DE 13- Memorandum Decision, #7 DE 14- Order, #8 DE 16- Motion to Reconsider, #9 DE 18- Response, #10 DE 19- Reply, #11 DE 20- Order Granting Motion to Alter and Amend, #12 DE 21- First Amended Complaint, #13 DE 22- Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, #14 DE 22- Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, #15 DE 26- Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding, #16 DE 28- Notice of Appeal, #17 Certified Docket Sheet)(cnw, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number Adversary Proceeding No. 18-3. File received, filed by Ray Moore. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal docket entry 28, #2 Order Dismissing Adv proceedings docket entry 26, #3 memorandum decision docket entry 13, #4 Order docket entry 14, #5 US Bankruptcy Court adversary Proceeding Docket 18-03061)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Automotive Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Automotive Finance Corporation
Represented By: Richard Scott Williams
Represented By: Frederick Darrell Clarke, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ray Moore
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?