Lett v. PNC Bank, N.A. (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Rickey Lett
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00226
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett.(wcl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett.(wcl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (wcl, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 39 Return Receipt Card showing service of #26 order signed by Rickey Lett for Rickey Lett served on 7/9/2019.(kh, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Object re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint "and for More Definite Statement on or before August 8, 2019", by Rickey Lett. (wcl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Merits by Rickey Lett. (wcl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Obligations and Discovery by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Collins, John)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #28 Motion for Judgment on the Merits, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/9/2019. (wcl, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Judgment on the Merits by Rickey Lett. (wcl, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #10 , #11 , #15 , #16 , #18 , and #22 Motions for Judgment on the Merits. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/8/2019. (wcl, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Plf, if any there be, as to why the #25 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 8/8/2019; copies mailed CMRRR and regular mail to plf. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/8/2019. (wcl, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Collins, John)
June 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #19 , #20 , & #21 pro se motions for recusal of the Magistrate Judge are DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/25/2019. (alm, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PNC Bank, N.A., filed by Rickey Lett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(wcl, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Judgment on the Merits by Rickey Lett. (wcl, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (wcl, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (wcl, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Recusation by Rickey Lett. (wcl, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Judgment on the Merits by Rickey Lett. (wcl, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) PNC Bank's #7 Motion for More Definite Statement is GRANTED; 2) PNC #7 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot; 3) Lett is ORDERED to file an amended complaint, on or before 6/26/2019,that more fully sets forth his claims against PNC Bank, and that complies with the FRCP and the following requirements of this Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/12/2019. (wcl, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Merits by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Merits by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 Objection to re #13 REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Rickey Lett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(kh, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Collins, John) Modified on 5/20/2019 to clarify the text (kh, ).
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rickey Lett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(kh, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Merits by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Merits by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
April 24, 2019 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and/or MOTION for More Definite Statement, filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #7 for pdf)(kh, ) Modified on 6/12/2019 to clarify the docket text (qc/wcl, ).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pending before the court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for a More Definite Statement. Doc. #7 . It is ORDERED that on or before May 8, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion (Doc. #7 ), and Defendant may file a reply on or before May 15, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 4/24/2019. (kh, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and/or MOTION for More Definite Statement Incorporated Memorandum of Law by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Collins, John). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 6/12/2019 (qc/wcl, ). Modified on 6/12/2019 to clarify the docket text (qc/wcl, ).
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Collins, John)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by A. Woodard for PNC Bank, N.A. served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (kh, )
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/4/2019. (kh, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PNC Bank, N.A. and mailed CMRRR with copy #1 complaint. (kh, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rickey Lett. (kh, )
March 29, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rickey Lett. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PNC Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052991.), filed by Rickey Lett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lett v. PNC Bank, N.A. (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John David Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?