Goodgame v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Loretha Goodgame
Defendant: Allstar Recovery, LLC and Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00241
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER directing arbitration and STAYING CASE as follows: (1) plf's claims against defs in this matter, including any claims that could have been asserted in this matter, are compelled to arbitration; (2) the arbitration is to be initiated by plf; (3) further ORDERING that this case is stayed pending conclusion of the arbitration. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/23/19. (djy, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before May 17, 2019. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/8/2019. (kh, )
April 30, 2019 ***Attorney Kristin Amanda Carter for Allstar Recovery, LLC added pursuant to the #7 Joint Stipulation. (no pdf document attached to this entry (kh, )
April 30, 2019 ***Attorneys Matthew Thomas Mitchell and Kristen Peters Watson for Credit Acceptance Corporation added pursuant to the #7 Joint Stipulation. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STIPULATION To Arbitrate and Stay Case by Credit Acceptance Corporation, Allstar Recovery, LLC, and Loretha Goodgame. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Matthew) Modified on 5/1/2019 to add as filed on behalf of additional parties(kh, ).
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Laura McHaney for Allstar Recovery, LLC served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (kh, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by (illegible) for Credit Acceptance Corporation served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (kh, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Loretha Goodgame (kh, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allstar Recovery, LLC, Credit Acceptance Corporation. and mailed CMRRR w/ copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Loretha Goodgame. (kh, )
April 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Loretha Goodgame. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf) (kh, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstar Recovery, LLC, Credit Acceptance Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053090.), filed by Loretha Goodgame. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodgame v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretha Goodgame
Represented By: Wallace Whitney Seals
Represented By: John Crad Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstar Recovery, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Amanda Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Mitchell
Represented By: Kristen Peters Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?