Phillips v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Scott D. Phillips
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00247
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020, at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 2E, before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher; Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher; Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2019; Discovery due by 2/5/2020; Mediation Notice due by 2/10/2020; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 3/6/2020; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 7/9/2019. (Furnished: Calendar & DH) (alm, )
May 31, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 14 ORDER - Attorney Tenley Elizabeth Armstrong terminated. (No pdf attached) (kr, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 5/31/2019. (No pdf attached) (kr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Eugene Clark on behalf of Starbucks Corporation (Clark, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as counsel by Starbucks Corporation. (Armstrong, Tenley)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Correction re #10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach a corrected PDF document to include the correct signature and service dates. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry #10 )(kr, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Scott D. Phillips. (Schwartz, Andrew) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/16/2019) (kr, ). Modified on 5/16/2019 to attach the corrected PDF document to include the correct signature and service dates (kr, ).
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Scott D. Phillips; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(kr, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher; Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kr, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kr, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Armstrong, Tenley)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/8/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/8/2019, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/18/2019. (kr, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES - Scott D. Phillips, Starbucks Corporation (kr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Starbucks Corporation. (kr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Starbucks Corporation.(kr, )
April 5, 2019 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Starbucks Corporation re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (kr, )
April 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Scott D. Phillips. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (kr, )
April 5, 2019 COMPLAINT against Starbucks Corporation, filed by Scott D. Phillips. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf)(kr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Starbucks Corporation from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-cv-2019-900404.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053126) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt) (kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott D. Phillips
Represented By: Andrew R Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Tenley Elizabeth Armstrong
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Represented By: Kevin Eugene Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?