Bender v. Hilton Hotel Corporation

Plaintiff: Amy Bender
Defendant: Hilton Hotel Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00271
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #7 Notice of Service which has been stricken pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 regarding Non-Filing of Civil Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 26.3 Excerpt)(kh, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE by Amy Bender (Davis, Lindsey) Modified on 6/5/2019 (kh, ). (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/5/2019) (kh, ).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 5/1/2020; Mediation Notice due by 4/3/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2019; Discovery due by 4/10/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/29/2019. (furn: calendar, ag)(kh, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hamby, David)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER: ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than May 27, 2019, as further set in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/6/2019. (kh, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amy Bender. (Middlemas, Davis)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hilton Hotel Corporation. (Hamby, David)
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of FILING #1 Notice of Removal by Hilton Hotel Corporation (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 12, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by Hilton Hotel Corporation.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amy Bender. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 12, 2019 COMPLAINT against Hilton Hotel Corporation, filed by Amy Bender.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hilton Hotel Corporation from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2018-902111.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053234) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record Part 2, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 State Court Answer, #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. Hilton Hotel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Bender
Represented By: Davis Lawson Middlemas, Sr.
Represented By: Lindsey Lee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Hotel Corporation
Represented By: David A Hamby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?