Owens v. First Credit Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erica Owens
Defendant: First Credit Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00288
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Erica Owens (Hoeffel, Joseph)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Erica Owens; First Credit Services, Inc. waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Hoeffel, Joseph)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Correction re #9 Request for Waiver of Service, to attach a corrected PDF document; Counsel erroneously attached the wrong PDF document. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #9 )(alm, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Error re #8 Request for Waiver of Service, which is hereby STRICKEN from the record; The document that was e-filed is a Northern District of Alabama form with the incorrect case information. (alm, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendant, First Credit Services, Inc. on 04/30/2019 by Erica Owens. Waiver of Service due by 5/30/2019. (Hoeffel, Joseph) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/30/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document; Counsel erroneously attached the wrong PDF document.) (alm, ) Modified on 4/30/2019 (alm, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #10 NOTICE) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendant, First Credit Services, Inc. on 04/30/2019 by Erica Owens. Waiver of Service due by 5/30/2019. (Hoeffel, Joseph) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/30/2019 to attach a properly published PDF) (alm, ). Modified on 4/30/2019 (alm, ). Modified on 4/30/2019 (alm, ).
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Erica Owens re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hoeffel, Joseph)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Joseph Carlo Hoeffel Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Hoeffel is hereby admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plf for all further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/29/2019. (alm, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to First Credit Services, Inc. & returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (alm, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Erica Owens; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Erica Owens. (alm, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Admit Joseph Carlo Hoeffel Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 4602053326) by Erica Owens. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Receipt)(alm, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Credit Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053325), filed by Erica Owens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, )
April 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Erica Owens. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. First Credit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Owens
Represented By: Joseph Carlo Hoeffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Credit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?