Bowers v. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shateace Bowers
Defendant: General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00297
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Laura McHaney for General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (kr, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.; mailed CMRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (kr, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Shateace Bowers. (kr, )
April 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shateace Bowers. (No pdf attached to this entry - See docket entry #1 ) (kr, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053353.), filed by Shateace Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shateace Bowers
Represented By: Micah Stephen Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?