United States of America et al v. Mims Management Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: State of Alabama, United States of America, State of North Carolina, State of Nevada, State of Florida, State of New Mexico, State of South Carolina, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Ohio, State of Arizona, State of Virginia, State of Wisconsin, United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, State of Mississippi, State of Pennsylvania, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Texas, State of Georgia and State of California
Defendant: Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Mims Management Group, LLC, Krystal Mims and Daniel Mims
Case Number: 2:2019cv00318
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 129 ANSWER to #127 Second Amended Complaint by Mims Management Group, LLC.(Ross, Brett)
September 25, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Dfts State of Arkansas, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Hawaii, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Louisiana, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Texas, State of Virginia, & State of Wisconsin re #126 Notice.(amf, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 127 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt.(Price, Emily)
September 25, 2019 Filing 126 Joint NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of State Plaintiffs by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt, Mims Management Group, LLC, Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims. (Price, Emily) Modified on 9/25/2019 to add as also filed on behalf of the Dfts (amf, ).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #124 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint; the relators shall file an amended complaint on or before 9/24/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/23/2019. (amf, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt. (Price, Emily)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the #122 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is granted; Relators shall file the amended complaint within five business days. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/11/2019. (kr, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 122 MOTION to Amend/Correct #78 Amended Complaint by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Price, Emily)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying #118 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/8/2019. (alm, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 120 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2019 re #118 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order filed by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 11:46 - 12:03.) (ag, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 TEXT ORDER re #118 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order; a telephone conference is set for 8/7/2019, at 11:15 AM; parties are DIRECTED to call chambers at 334-954-3650 when all participating attorneys are on the line. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/31/2019. (Furnished: Calendar & AG) (No PDF attached to this entry)(alm, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt. (Price, Oscar)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Erica D. Lindsay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/8/2019. (alm, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, by 7/22/2019, attorney Lindsay shall file a motion for admission pro hac vice admission, as further set out in order; If attorney Lindsay does not respond, the court will assume she does not intend to continue as counsel in this matter, and will enter an order withdrawing her as counsel on the case. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/8/2019. (alm, )
June 27, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - Attorney Nicholas W. Armstrong for United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas W. Armstrong on behalf of United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt (Armstrong, Nicholas) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add as also filed on behalf of Plf Thweatt (alm, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 113 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daniel Mims re #107 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Ross, Brett) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add the link to the #107 Notice (alm, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 112 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC re #107 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Ross, Brett) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add the link to the #107 Notice (alm, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 111 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #107 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Ross, Brett) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add the link to the #107 Notice (alm, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 110 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mims Management Group, LLC re #107 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Ross, Brett) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add the link to the #107 Notice (alm, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 109 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Krystal Mims re #107 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Ross, Brett) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add the link to the #107 Notice (alm, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 108 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt re #106 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Price, Oscar) Modified on 6/27/2019 to add the link to the #106 Notice (alm, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 107 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mims Management Group, LLC, Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Daniel Mims, & Krystal Mims; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 106 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood & United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 105 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (Wadsworth, Stephen)
June 19, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D Wadsworth on behalf of United States of America (Wadsworth, Stephen)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: (1) The joint motion for extension of deadlines (doc. no. #102 ) is granted to the extent set forth below; (2) The revised uniform scheduling order (doc. no. #99 ) is modified in the following respects: (A) The pretrial is reset from 3/13/2020, to 10/29/2020, at 10:00 a.m.; and the trial is reset from 4/7/2020, to the term of court beginning on 12/7/2020, with all unexpired deadlines expressly tied to these two dates adjusted accordingly; (B) The deadline for amending pleadings and adding parties is extended from 3/22/2019, to 9/6/2019; (C) The deadline for plaintiff's expert reports is extended to 10/4/2019, and the deadline for defendants' reports is extended to 11/1/2019; (D) The deadline for completing discovery is extended from 6/28/2019, to 2/28/2020; (E) The deadline for the parties' settlement conference is extended from 8/2/2019, to 3/13/2020; (F) The deadline for filing dispositive and Daubert motions is extended from 8/30/2019, to 3/27/2020; (G) All other deadlines are unchanged. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/13/2019. (Furn: Calendar, AG) (PTC reset from 3/13/2020; Jury Trial reset from 4/7/2020) (kr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 102 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Mims Management Group, LLC, Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LL, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Krystal Mims, Daniel Mims, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt, United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood. (Ross, Brett) Modified on 6/7/2019 to add additional filers (alm, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Andrea Daniel-Canegata to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/7/2019. (alm, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REVISED UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Amended Pleadings due by 3/22/2019; Discovery due by 6/28/2019; Mediation Notice due by 8/9/2019; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 8/30/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/7/2019. (Furnished: Calendar & AG)(alm, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 100 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee Received re #98 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602053802. (alm, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Andrea Daniel-Canegata to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood. (Daniel-Canegata, Andrea)
May 29, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Harris on behalf of Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims, Mims Management Group, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Harris, Daniel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Correction re #91 MOTION to Withdraw and MOTION to Substitute Attorney, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the date submitted on the pleading as 5/16/2019 & not 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #91 )(alm, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Deficiency re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Attorney Andrea Daniel-Canegata.(alm, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Deficiency re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Attorney Steven K. McCallister.(alm, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Deficiency re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Attorney Erica D. Lindsay. (alm, )
May 22, 2019 *** Attorney Shannon Strickland Frankel terminated pursuant to #92 order (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #91 Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel; attorney Shannon S. Frankel is withdrawn and attorney Brett A. Ross is substituted as counsel for the defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/22/19. (djy, )
May 16, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #91 MOTION - ***Attorney Brett A. Ross for Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims, & Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION to Withdraw and MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mims Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Brett). Added MOTION to Withdraw on 5/17/2019 (alm, ). Modified on 5/17/2019 to clarify the docket text (alm, ). (Main Document 91 replaced on 5/23/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the date submitted on the pleading as 5/16/2019 & not 5/15/2019) (alm, ).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: if a party chooses to consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, counsel for the party is DIRECTED to complete the consent form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/13/2019. (alm, )
May 10, 2019 PURSUANT TO THE #89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - ***Attorney Emily Kornegay Price for United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood & for United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Oscar M Price, IV & Emily K. Price on behalf of United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt (Price, Oscar)
May 1, 2019 Filing 88 Case transferred in from the Eastern District of North Carolina; Case Number 5:14-cv-00907-RJ; Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (alm, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER, entered in ED/NC, granting #85 Motion to Change Venue. This matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/1/2019. (alm, )
April 24, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: #85 MOTION to Change Venue. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 86 Memorandum in Support, filed in ED/NC, re #85 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims, Mims Management Group, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of January Green, #2 Exhibit B - Realtors' Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Initial Disclosures)(alm, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Change Venue, filed in ED/NC, filed by Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims, Mims Management Group, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (alm, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 84 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed in ED/NC, filed by Shannon Strickland Frankel on behalf of Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims, Mims Management Group, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc. substituting for Terrie Scott Morgan, William J. Long IV. (alm, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SCHEDULING ORDER, entered in ED/NC: Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Motions due by 8/30/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 9/5/2018. Parties should read the order in its entirety for additional deadline information. (alm, )
September 4, 2018 REFERRED to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: #82 Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
September 4, 2018 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, entered in ED/NC; At the direction of the Court and with the consent of the parties, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:14-CV-907-RJ. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/4/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER, entered in ED/NC, regarding #82 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Kristina S. Greenwood. This matter comes now before the court upon joint report of the parties in accordance with the court's initial order regarding planning and scheduling. The parties report agreement to magistrate judge jurisdiction and and do not desire conference in advance of entry of the case management order. The court directs the clerk to assign the case to a full-time magistrate judge. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/4/2018. (No pdf attached to this entry)(alm, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 82 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), filed in ED/NC, filed by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood.(alm, )
August 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding 80 Rule 26(f) Report (joint); Opposing counsel's electronic signature block is not provided on this document despite it being filed as a joint report; Counsel is directed to refile the pleading to include the signatures of all counsel; See Section IV.D.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual; In addition, an illegible or improperly formatted document has been filed; Counsel is directed to Local Rule 10.1 (a) which specifies the format of pleadings which states that all pleadings, motions, discovery procedures, memoranda, and other papers filed with the clerk of court shall be double-spaced on single-sided, standard letter size (8 1/2 x 11) paper, with all typed matter appearing in at least 11 point font size with a one inch margin on all sides; The format and spacing in this document varies; Counsel is directed to refile within five business days of the date of this notice. (No pdf attached to this entry)(alm, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 81 ANSWER, filed in ED/NC, to #78 Amended Complaint by Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims, Mims Management Group, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (alm, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 80 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), filed in ED/NC, filed by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood.(alm, )
July 31, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #79 Response; Wrong event used; Counsel is directed to refile this document using the event Rule 26(f) report (joint) found under the "Discovery Documents" category. (No pdf attached to this entry)(alm, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 79 **Disregard - Corrected and refiled at #80 ** RESPONSE to Order Joint Status Report and Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Kristina S. Greenwood. (alm, )
July 30, 2018 Notice to Counsel; Pursuant to the Initial Order entered 6/20/18, a Discovery Plan was due by 7/27/18; The parties are directed immediately to file same or file the appropriate motion not later than 5 days herefrom showing good cause for failure to comply with the court's directive and need for extension, if applicable. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 78 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed in ED/NC, against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt. (alm, )
June 25, 2018 Filing 77 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed in ED/NC, filed by Christopher M. Anderson on behalf of United States of America substituting for G. Norman Acker, III. (alm, )
June 25, 2018 Filing 76 Notice of Appearance, filed in ED/NC, filed by Christopher M. Anderson on behalf of United States of America.(alm, )
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 INITIAL ORDER, filed in ED/NC, REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 7/27/18. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/22/2018. (alm, )
June 19, 2018 Filing 74 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed in ED/NC, by Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims, Mims Management Group, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (alm, )
June 12, 2018 Filing 73 Waiver of Service, filed in ED/NC, Returned Executed filed by Kristina S. Greenwood. All Defendants. (alm, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 72 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, filed by Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims, Mims Management Group, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #67 Financial Disclosure Statement, #70 Financial Disclosure Statement, #71 Financial Disclosure Statement, #68 Financial Disclosure Statement, #69 Financial Disclosure Statement. (alm, )
May 16, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY, filed in ED/NC, re: #71 Financial Disclosure Statement, #67 Financial Disclosure Statement, #70 Financial Disclosure Statement, #68 Financial Disclosure Statement, #69 Financial Disclosure Statement; FRCP 5(d)(1) requires a certificate of service; Counsel is directed to file a captioned document titled Certificate of Service using the Certificate of Service event located under the Service of Process category, and linking the appropriate documents when prompted. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 71 Financial Disclosure Statement, filed in ED/NC, by Mims Management Group, LLC. (alm, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 70 Financial Disclosure Statement, filed in ED/NC, by Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(alm, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 69 Financial Disclosure Statement, filed in ED/NC, by Krystal Mims. (alm, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 68 Financial Disclosure Statement, filed in ED/NC, by Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mims Management Group, LLC for Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC. (alm, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 67 Financial Disclosure Statement, filed in ED/NC, by Daniel Mims. (alm, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 66 Notice of Appearance, filed in ED/NC, filed by Terrie S. Morgan on behalf of Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC, Daniel Mims, Krystal Mims, Mims Management Group, LLC, Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (alm, )
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER, entered in ED/NC, - The States' notice that the States are not intervening at this time and this Order be unsealed and served upon the defendants by relators. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/3/2018. (alm, )
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER, entered in ED/NC, to Unseal Case - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/3/2018. (alm, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE, filed in ED/NC, OF THE STATES ARE NOT INTERVENING AT THIS TIME filed by State of North Carolina, The State of Arizona, The State of Arkansas, The State of California, The State of Colorado, The State of Connecticut, The State of Florida, The State of Georgia, The State of Hawaii, The State of Indiana, The State of Iowa, The State of Louisiana, The State of Nevada, The State of New Mexico, The State of Texas, The State of Virginia, The State of West Virginia, The State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE, filed in ED/NC, THAT THE UNITED STATES IS NOT INTERVENING AT THIS TIME filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER, entered in ED/NC, granting #58 Motion for Extension of Time to Intervene; The parties shall have up to and including 3/27/18 in which to intervene or file other responsive pleading; This case shall remain under seal during this period, and until further Order from this Court. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/26/2018. (alm, )
January 25, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: re #58 MOTION for Extension of Time. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
January 23, 2018 Filing 60 Notice of Appearance, filed in ED/NC, for State of North Carolina, United States of America by Lareena J. Phillips. (alm, )
January 23, 2018 Filing 59 Memorandum in Support, filed in ED/NC, re #58 MOTION for Extension of Time. (alm, )
January 23, 2018 Filing 58 JOINT MOTION, filed in ED/NC, for Extension of Time for Election to Intervene filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER, entered in ED/NC, denying #55 Sixth Motion for Extension of Time to Intervene; The court will maintain seal in this action until 1/26/18. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/22/2017.(alm, )
December 22, 2017 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: re #55 Motion to Extend Time to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading. (No pdf attached to this entry)(alm, )
December 21, 2017 Filing 55 SEALED SIXTH MOTION, filed in ED/NC, To Extend Time to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SEALED ORDER, entered in ED/NC, regarding Sealed Motion to Partially Lift Seal and Fifth Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/29/2017. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 52 SEALED MOTION, filed in ED/NC, to Partially Lift Seal and Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading filed by United States of America. (Castania, M) (Attachment(s): # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 51 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Virginia(alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 50 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Texas. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 49 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of South Carolina. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 48 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Pennsylvania.(alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 47 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Ohio. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 46 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of New Mexico. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 45 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Nevada. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 44 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Mississippi. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 43 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Louisiana.(alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 42 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Iowa (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 41 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Indiana. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 40 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Hawaii. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 39 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Georgia.(alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 38 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Connecticut. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 37 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of California.(alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 36 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of Wisconsin.(alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 35 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Florida Attorney General. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 34 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Colorado Attorney General.(alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 33 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Arkansas Attorney General. (alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 32 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Arizona Attorney General.(alm, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 31 Certificate of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Order of Seal served on Attorney General of Alabama. (alm, )
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Ex Parte ORDER, entered in ED/NC, granting #28 Fourth EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/3/2017.(alm, )
December 29, 2016 Filing 29 Ex Parte MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, filed in ED/NC, re #28 Fourth EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint by United States of America. (alm, )
December 29, 2016 Filing 28 Fourth EX PARTE MOTION, filed in ED/NC, to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Ex Parte ORDER, entered in ED/NC, granting #23 Third EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/30/2016. (alm, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, entered in ED/NC, granting #25 Motion to Seal #24 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/30/2016. (alm, )
June 30, 2016 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #25 MOTION to Seal, #24 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 30, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION to Seal, filed in ED/NC, #24 PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
June 30, 2016 Filing 24 SEALED Memorandum in Support, filed in ED/NC, re #23 Third EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint by United States of America. (alm, )
June 30, 2016 Filing 23 Third EX PARTE MOTION, filed in ED/NC, to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Ex Parte ORDER, entered in ED/NC, granting #20 Second EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/14/2016. (alm, )
January 5, 2016 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support, filed in ED/NC, re #20 Second EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint by United States of America.(alm, )
January 5, 2016 Filing 20 Second EX PARTE MOTION, filed in ED/NC, to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Ex Parte, entered in ED/NC, granting #17 First EX PARTE MOTION for a Partial Lifting of the Seal - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/7/2015. (alm, )
December 2, 2015 *SEALED* Ex Parte Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan re #17 Ex Parte Motion for a Partial Lifting of the Seal by United States of America. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 18 Ex Parte Memorandum in Support, filed in ED/NC, by United States of America re #17 EX PARTE MOTION for a Partial Lifting of the Seal by United States of America. (alm, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 17 First EX PARTE MOTION, filed in ED/NC, for a Partial Lifting of the Seal by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Ex parte ORDER, entered in ED/NC, granting #12 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/13/2015. (alm, )
April 9, 2015 *SEALED* Ex Parte Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanangan - #12 EX PARTE MOTION. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
April 8, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance, filed in ED/NC, by Steven K. McCallister on behalf of United States of America.(alm, )
April 8, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance, filed in ED/NC, by G. Norman Acker, III on behalf of United States of America. (alm, )
April 8, 2015 Filing 13 (EX PARTE) Memorandum in Support, filed in ED/NC, regarding #12 EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint by United States of America.(alm, )
April 8, 2015 Filing 12 EX PARTE MOTION, filed in ED/NC, to Extend Time Within Which to Intervene or File Other Responsive Pleading and to Maintain Seal Over Qui Tam Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(alm, )
February 9, 2015 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Disclosure Statement served on Attorney General of the United States on 2/09/2015.(alm, )
February 9, 2015 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits and Disclosure Statement served on Office of the United States Attorney of North Carolina on 2/9/2015. (alm,
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, entered in ED/NC, granting #6 Motion to Seal Case - This case shall remain under seal for 120 days; Such time period may be extended only for good cause shown; Further, the complaint shall not be served on the dfts until the court so orders; Within the 120 day time frame, the government and states are DIRECTED to proceed in this action or notify the court of their decision otherwise. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/16/2015. (alm, )
January 12, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance, filed in ED/NC, for non-district counsel by Erica D. Lindsay on behalf of United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(alm, )
January 7, 2015 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #6 MOTION to Seal Case. (No pdf attached to this entry)(alm, )
January 6, 2015 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed in ED/NC, for Complaint, Exhibits, Disclosure Statement served on Attorney General's Office on 01/06/2015, filed by The State of Alabama, The State of Arizona, The State of Arkansas, The State of California, The State of Colorado, The State of Connecticut, The State of Florida, The State of Georgia, The State of Hawaii, The State of Indiana, The State of Iowa, The State of Louisiana, The State of Mississippi, The State of Nevada, The State of New Mexico, The State of North Carolina, The State of Ohio, The State of Pennsylvania, The State of South Carolina, The State of Texas, The State of Virginia, The State of West Virginia, The State of Wisconsin, Misty Stoffregen Thweatt, United States of America. (alm, )
December 31, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Case, filed in ED/NC, filed by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt. (alm, )
December 31, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance, filed in ED/NC, by Andrea Daniel-Canegata on behalf of United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt. (alm, )
December 31, 2014 Filing 4 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, filed in ED/NC, filed by United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt.(alm, )
December 31, 2014 Filing 3 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, filed in ED/NC, filed by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood. (alm, )
December 31, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE (Exhibit #16 - 2/18/2011 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice), filed in ED/NC, re #1 Complaint filed by United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17 - Reimbursement Challenges & Pharmacy Benchmarks by Daniel Mims, #2 Exhibit 18 - Laurel Oaks PRN/OTC Not Dispensed - Feb. 2011 Spreadsheet,, #3 Exhibit 19 - Parameter report - January 2011 "Med Usage Rebate Report", #4 Exhibit 20 - Parameter report - February 2011 "Med Usage Report", #5 Exhibit 21 - Tablet Splitting AWP/WAC Price List (Abilify), #6 Exhibit 22 - Tablet Splitting AWP/WAC Price List (Lexapro), #7 Exhibit 23 - Tablet Splitting AWP/WAC Price List (Zyprexa), #8 Exhibit 24 - Tablet Splitting AWP/WAC Price List (Invega), #9 Exhibit 25 - Tablet Splitting AWP/WAC Price List (Seroquel), #10 Exhibit 26 - IPS Annual Revenue Report)(alm, )
December 31, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed in ED/NC, against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number RAL041567), filed by United States of America, United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood, United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 - 1- The Pines higher than Holly Hill - November 2010 Spreadsheet, #4 Exhibit 2 - Parameter report - November 2010 "Holly Hill Hospital Invoice", #5 Exhibit 3 - 11/9/2010 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice, #6 Exhibit 4 - 11/18/2010 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice, #7 Exhibit 5 - 12/1/2010 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice, #8 Exhibit 6 - 12/7/2010 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice, #9 Exhibit 7 - 12/14/2010 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice, #10 Exhibit 8 - 1/11/2011 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice, #11 Exhibit 9 - The Brynn Marr Higher than Holly Hill - November 2010 Spreadsheet, #12 Exhibit 10 - 11/2/2010 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice, #13 Exhibit 11 - 12/1/2010 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice, #14 Exhibit 12 - 12/7/2010 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice, #15 Exhibit 13 - Laurel Oaks Medicaid Higher than Laurel Oak Hospital Inpatients - February 2011 Spreadsheet, #16 Exhibit 14 - Parameter report - February 2011 "Laurel Oaks Hospital Invoice", #17 Exhibit 15 - 2/4/2011 NC Medicaid Remittance and Status Advice)(alm, ) Modified on 5/8/2019 - to reflect that the COMPLAINT was UNSEALED by ED NC pursuant to #64 order, exhibits remain under seal in doc entry #1 & #2 (qc/djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Mims Management Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brett A. Ross
Represented By: Daniel Harris
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institutional Pharmacy Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brett A. Ross
Represented By: Daniel Harris
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mims Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Brett A. Ross
Represented By: Daniel Harris
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystal Mims
Represented By: Brett A. Ross
Represented By: Daniel Harris
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mims
Represented By: Brett A. Ross
Represented By: Daniel Harris
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Erica D. Lindsay
Represented By: Steven K. McCallister
Represented By: Stephen D Wadsworth
Represented By: Lareena Phillips
Represented By: Christopher M. Anderson
Represented By: Erica Lindsay
Represented By: Steve K. McCallister
Represented By: Lareena J. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Lareena Phillips
Represented By: Lareena J. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel Kristina S. Greenwood
Represented By: Oscar M Price, IV
Represented By: Erica D. Lindsay
Represented By: Andrea Daniel-Canegata
Represented By: Nicholas W. Armstrong
Represented By: Emily Kornegay Price
Represented By: Erica Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel Misty Stoffregen Thweatt
Represented By: Oscar M Price, IV
Represented By: Erica D. Lindsay
Represented By: Andrea Daniel-Canegata
Represented By: Nicholas W. Armstrong
Represented By: Emily Kornegay Price
Represented By: Erica Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?