Desselle v. Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC
Plaintiff: Stephanie M. Desselle
Defendant: Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00338
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Stephanie M. Desselle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Long, Felicia)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (alm, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Correction re #6 Order to Show Cause, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct a typographical error in the name of the Dft in the case title. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #6 )(alm, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Plf, if any exists, as to why #11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION to Compel Arbitration should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2019; Dft may file a reply on or before 7/8/2019; DIRECTING counsel for the parties to complete and to send to the Clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 7/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/20/2019. (alm, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC. (Treadwell, Mark). Added MOTION to Compel Arbitration on 6/19/2019 (alm, ). Modified on 6/19/2019 to clarify the docket text (alm, ).
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC. (alm, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC. (Treadwell, Mark)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Allen Treadwell, III on behalf of Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC (Treadwell, Mark) Modified on 6/17/2019 to reflect as filed on behalf of Dft "Ivy Creek" and not "All Dfts" (alm, ).
June 11, 2019 Copy of #7 Application and Case File delivered to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Stephanie M. Desselle against Ivy Creek D/B/A Physical Express. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Fonteneau, Kira)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Plf, if any exists, as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute her claims; Show Cause Response due by 6/18/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/11/2019. (alm, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/20/2019 to attach a corrected pdf document to correct a typographical error in the name of the Dft in the case title) (alm, ). Modified on 6/20/2019 (alm, ).
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Kitty Bryans for Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (dmn, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint & #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (alm, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Stephanie M. Desselle. (alm, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stephanie M. Desselle. (alm, )
May 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephanie M. Desselle. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053541), filed by Stephanie M. Desselle. (Attachments: #1 Request for Service by Certified Mail, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desselle v. Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Creek Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Mark Allen Treadwell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie M. Desselle
Represented By: Kira Yalon Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?