Ellison v. Turning Point Foundation (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Jacob Ellison
Defendant: Turning Point Foundation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00344
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Joint First AMENDED MOTION to approve settlement agreement; ORDERING that the Court hereby APPROVES the settlement, and the parties are DIRECTED to finalize the settlement through the execution of the settlement agreement (Doc. #14 -1) and the exchange of consideration as set forth in the settlement agreement, which is approved by the court as to its form; Based upon this resolution by the parties, all FLSA claims plaintiff has or may have, including, but not limited to, any claims for wages, overtime, attorney's fees, costs, expenses or other relief, award and damages are hereby resolved. ORDERING that such claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; directing the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP and to close the case; the Court retains jurisdiction over this matter and the parties until all payments under the settlement agreement are made pursuant to its terms. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/18/19. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, ) Modified on 6/20/2019 to correct typos in the docket text (qc/wcl, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 First Amended Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement by Jacob Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stastny, Steven) Modified on 6/17/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Turning Point Foundation (qc/djy, ). Modified on 6/20/2019 to clarify the docket text (qc/wcl, ).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING without prejudice the #7 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement, as further set out in Order; the parties may submit an amended motion for the court's consideration that addresses the court's concerns regarding the overly broad release and the need for documentary support of the attorney's fees claim within 20 days of the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/10/2019. (am, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Turning Point Foundation re #8 Notice of Deficiency. (Adair, Robert) Modified on 5/24/2019 to clarify text as satisfying #8 Notice of Deficiency(am, ).
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Turning Point Foundation. (am, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Turning Point Foundation; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
May 23, 2019 MEMORANDUM of Law re #7 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of FLSA Settlement filed by Jacob Ellison & Turning Point Foundation. (NO PDF attached - See doc #7 ). (am, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Turning Point Foundation. (am, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Jacob Ellison. (am, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of FLSA Settlement by Jacob Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Stastny, Steven) Modified on 5/23/2019 to clarify text as also filed on behalf of Turning Point Foundation(am, ).
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by illegible for Turning Point Foundation served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (am, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Turning Point Foundation.(Adair, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Turning Point Foundation and mailed CMRRR w/copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jacob Ellison. (am, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jacob Ellison. (am, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Turning Point Foundation, filed by Jacob Ellison. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602053558.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. Turning Point Foundation (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turning Point Foundation
Represented By: Robert Brett Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Ellison
Represented By: Steven Michael Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?