Robinson et al v. Marshall
Plaintiff: Yashica Robinson, Alabama Women's Center and Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc.
Defendant: Mark H. LeQuire, Ashley Rich, Hays Webb, Scott Harris, Steven Marshall, James H. Walburn and Danny Carr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00365
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER directing that the issue of discovery is set for submission, without oral argument, on 8/19/2019, with the defendant to file a brief by 8/5/2019, and the plaintiffs to do the same by 8/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/16/19. (djy, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER directing that on or before 8/5/2019, the def is to file a response to the plfs' #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/16/19. (djy, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Telephone Conference held on 7/15/2019 (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 2:52 - 3:40.) (ag, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 59 STATUS REPORT (Joint Report of Parties' Pre-Status Conference Meet-and-Confer) by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Marshall, Randall)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER granting #56 Motion for Susan Lambiase Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/9/19. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
July 8, 2019 ***Attorney Susan Lambiase for Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, and West Alabama Women's Center added. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #56 ). (djy, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 57 Pro Hac Vice filing fee received re #56 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602054144. (alm, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Susan Lambiase to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 7/15/2019 @ 02:45 PM before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/3/19. Furnished to calendar group & AG. (No PDF document attached to this notice).(djy, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TEXT ORDER granting #53 Motion for Marcia Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/2/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 53 Motion for Marcia Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602054069.) by Greater Birmingham Chapter of the National Organization for Women. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Steven Marshall.(Chynoweth, Brad)
June 21, 2019 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support re #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Kolbi-Molinas, Alexa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolbi-Molinas, Alexa)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER, upon agreement of the parties, it is ORDERED that: (1) the #48 Joint MOTION to Dismiss is granted; (2) Defendant James H. Walburn, M.D., is dismissed without prejudice from this action, and is terminated as a party; (3) Defendant Walburn and his employees, agents, and successors in office shall be bound by the terms of any injunctive (including but not limited to a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction), declaratory, and/or other relief against the Alabama Attorney General and/or any of the other defs by any court in this action so long as such relief remains in effect as to any party, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/20/19. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Walburn without prejudice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall) Modified on 6/20/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of James H. Walburn (qc/djy, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Wallace Damon Mills on behalf of James H. Walburn (Mills, Wallace)
June 17, 2019 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., West Alabama Women's Center, Yashica Robinson, Reproductive Health Services, Alabama Women's Center. Steven Marshall waiver sent on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Marshall, Randall)
June 11, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr on behalf of Steven Marshall (LaCour, Edmund)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #22 , #23 , #24 , #28 , & #43 Joint Motions to Dismiss; Dfts Danny Carr, Daryl D. Bailey, Scott Harris, Mark H. LeQuire, Robert L. Broussard, Ashley Rich, and Hays Webb are dismissed without prejudice from this action, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/7/2019. (alm, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Dfts Broussard, Webb, and Rich Without Prejudice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center, Steven Marshall, Robert L. Broussard, Ashley Rich, Hays Webb. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall) Modified on 6/7/2019 to add as also filed on behalf of Dfts Marshall, Broussard, Rich, & Webb (alm, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hays Webb. (Chynoweth, Brad)
June 6, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ashley Rich. (Chynoweth, Brad)
June 6, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven Marshall. (Chynoweth, Brad)
June 6, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Robert L. Broussard. (Chynoweth, Brad)
June 6, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by James William Davis on behalf of Robert L. Broussard, Steven Marshall, Ashley Rich, Hays Webb (Davis, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad A. Chynoweth on behalf of Robert L. Broussard, Steven Marshall, Ashley Rich, Hays Webb (Chynoweth, Brad)
June 6, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Danny Carr. (Segall, Robert) Modified on 6/7/2019 to reflect as satisfying #29 notice of deficiency (qc/djy, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daryl D. Bailey. (Segall, Robert) Modified on 6/7/2019 to reflect as satisfying #30 notice of deficiency (qc/djy, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 34 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Scott Harris. (Billingsley, Dana) Modified on 6/7/2019 to reflect as satisfying #32 notice of deficiency (qc/djy, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mark H. LeQuire re #31 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hunter, Eric)
June 6, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Scott Harris; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mark LeQuire; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Daryl Bailey; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Danny Carr; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant LeQuire Without Prejudice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall) Modified on 6/6/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Mark LeQuire (qc/djy, ).
June 3, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Wilson Hunter on behalf of Mark H. LeQuire (Hunter, Eric)
June 3, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Dismiss def Harris Without Prejudice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall) Modified on 6/6/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of def Scott Harris (qc/djy, ).
June 3, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Dismiss def Bailey Without Prejudice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall) Modified on 6/6/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Danny Carr & Daryl Bailey (qc/djy, ).
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss def Carr Without Prejudice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall) Modified on 6/6/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Daryl Bailey and Danny Carr (qc/djy, ).
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert David Segall on behalf of Daryl D. Bailey, Danny Carr (Segall, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 27 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Suzy Vinson for Robert L. Broussard served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (djy, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 26 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Pam Crowe for Ashley Rich served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (djy, )
May 31, 2019 ***Attorney Carrie Y. Flaxman for Alabama Women's Center,Carrie Y. Flaxman for Reproductive Health Services,Carrie Y. Flaxman for Yashica Robinson,Carrie Y. Flaxman for West Alabama Women's Center added pursuant to #15 motion to appear pro hac vice (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 , #14 , and #15 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorneys Flaxman, Burrows, and Kolbi-Olinas. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/31/19. (djy, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 Received pro hac vice Filing fee for Carrie Flaxman re: #15 motion: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602053708 (djy, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 Filing fee received for Meagan Burrows re: #14 motion appear pro hac vice: Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602053707 (djy, ) Modified on 5/31/2019 to clarify text to reflect as re: #14 motion (qc/djy, ).
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 Filing fee received for Alexa Kolbi-Olinas re: #13 motion appear pro hac vice: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602053706 (djy, ).
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Helton Billingsley on behalf of Scott Harris (Billingsley, Dana)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 Motion for Carrie Flaxman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall) Modified on 5/31/2019 to include name of attorney (qc/djy, ).
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 Motion for Meagan Burrows to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall) Modified on 5/31/2019 to include name of attorney (qc/djy, ).
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for Alexa Kolbi-Olinas to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alabama Women's Center, Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., Reproductive Health Services, Yashica Robinson, West Alabama Women's Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Randall) Modified on 5/31/2019 to include name of attorney (qc/djy, ).
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by W. Myrick for Scott Harris served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (djy, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by J. Braddock for Danny Carr served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (djy, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Cheryle Franks for Hays Webb served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (djy, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Kimie Bush for James H. Walburn served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (djy, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Kimie Bush for Mark H. LeQuire served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (djy, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Daryl D. Bailey, Robert L. Broussard, Danny Carr, Scott Harris, Mark H. LeQuire, Steven Marshall, Ashley Rich, James H. Walburn, Hays Webb and mailed CMRRR w/copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Alabama Women's Center. (am, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Yashica Robinson. (am, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by West Alabama Women's Center. (am, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Reproductive Health Services. (am, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc. (am, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Daryl D. Bailey, Robert L. Broussard, Danny Carr, Scott Harris, Mark H. LeQuire, Steven Marshall, Ashley Rich, James H. Walburn, & Hays Webb, filed by Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc., West Alabama Women's Center, Yashica Robinson, Reproductive Health Services, & Alabama Women's Center. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 4602053655.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark H. LeQuire
Represented By: Eric Wilson Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Rich
Represented By: Brad A. Chynoweth
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hays Webb
Represented By: Brad A. Chynoweth
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Harris
Represented By: Dana Helton Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Marshall
Represented By: Brad A. Chynoweth
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Walburn
Represented By: Wallace Damon Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Carr
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yashica Robinson
Represented By: Meagan Marlis Burrows
Represented By: Randall Charles Marshall
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Represented By: Brock Boone
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Susan Lambiase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Women's Center
Represented By: Meagan Marlis Burrows
Represented By: Randall Charles Marshall
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Represented By: Brock Boone
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Susan Lambiase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Southeast Inc.
Represented By: Randall Charles Marshall
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Brock Boone
Represented By: Susan Lambiase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?