Carson et al v. Custom Air, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Carson and Stephen Carson
Defendant: Custom Air, LLC, Custom Air Inc., Potlachdeltic Forest Holdings Inc. and Comfort Air, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00376
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/19/2019. (kh, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020, in the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U. S. Courthouse, Montgomery, Alabama, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins;Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020,in Montgomery, Alabama, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 3/9/2020; Mediation Notice due by 2/15/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019; Discovery due by 2/10/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/17/2019. (furn: wr, calendar)(kh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Alvis, Labella)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Comfort Air, LLC re #18 Order, Jurisdictional Statement (Alvis, Labella)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Accordingly, Comfort Air, LLC, is DIRECTED to file a jurisdictional statement on or before July 25, 2019, to correct the deficient allegations of citizenship. See 28 U.S.C. 1653 ("Defective allegations of jurisdiction may be amended, upon terms, in the trial or appellate courts."). Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/11/2019. (kh, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OREDER: In its Answer, Defendant Comfort Air, LLC, states that it has been "erroneously sued as Custom Air, LLC, a/k/a Custom Air, Inc." (Doc. #1 , at 1.) Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the caption is AMENDED to reflect Defendant's correct name, "Custom Air, LLC." The parties are DIRECTED to use the new caption as it appears on this Order for all future submissions to the court, and the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to change the caption accordingly. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/10/2019. (kh, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Potlachdeltic Forest Holdings Inc. re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Nichols, John) Modified on 6/26/2019 to add the link to the #8 notice (wcl, ).
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Potlachdeltic Forest Holdings Inc.. (wcl, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leo R. McAloon, III. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/25/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leo R. McAloon, III (Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602054003.) by Potlachdeltic Forest Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Receipt) (wcl, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Custom Air, LLC re #7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Voss, Mickey) Modified on 6/21/2019 to add the link to the #7 notice (wcl, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stephen Carson, Virginia Carson re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Richardson, Arlene)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Stephen Carson, Virginia Carson; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) Modified on 6/20/2019 to correct the party names to reflect the plfs (wcl, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Potlachdeltic Forest Holdings Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Custom Air, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/19/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 7/19/2019, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/19/2019. (wcl, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Potlachdeltic Forest Holdings Inc..(Nichols, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Stephen Carson, Virginia Carson, Custom Air, LLC (kh, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Custom Air, LLC.(Voss, Mickey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Custom Air, LLC (kh, )
May 28, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Custom Air, LLC. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
May 28, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephen Carson, Virginia Carson. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #2 for pdf)(kh, )
May 28, 2019 COMPLAINT against Custom Air, LLC, Potlachdeltic Forest Holdings Inc., filed by Stephen Carson, Virginia Carson.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #2 for pdf)(kh, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Custom Air, LLC from Circuit Court of Crenshaw County, AL, case number 24-CV-2019-900029.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053687) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson et al v. Custom Air, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Air, LLC
Represented By: Mickey Jansen Voss
Represented By: Labella S. Alvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Air Inc.
Represented By: Mickey Jansen Voss
Represented By: Labella S. Alvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potlachdeltic Forest Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Mickey Jansen Voss
Represented By: Labella S. Alvis
Represented By: Leo R McAloon, III
Represented By: John Levi Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Air, LLC
Represented By: Mickey Jansen Voss
Represented By: Labella S. Alvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Carson
Represented By: Arlene Marceau Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Carson
Represented By: Arlene Marceau Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?