Powell v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: William Powell and William Scotty Powell
Defendant: State of Alabama, Steven T. Marshall and Crenshaw Sheriff Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv00413
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Petitioner's Response to the Court's #4 Order of June 18, 2019 by William Scotty Powell. (cnw, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 7/2/2019, Petitioner shall show cause why his petition for habeas relief should not be dismissed as moot as the offense challenged in this matter has been dismissed by the state court. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/18/2019. (cnw, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: It is ORDERED that Petitioner's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/17/2019. (cnw, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by William Powell. (es, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Powell.(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crenshaw Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Scotty Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?