Grissom v. Corizon et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Tracey Grissom
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections, Lt. Coleman, David Gams, Lt. Young, Chief Gordon, Nurse Gilcrest, Corizon, L. Jackson and Nurse Manuel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00420
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing that on or before 9/6/2019 the plf shall file a response to the reports filed by the defs addressing each of the arguments/defenses raised therein, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/13/19. (djy, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Corizon, David Gams, Nurse Gilcrest, L. Jackson, Nurse Manuel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dr. David Gams, #2 Exhibit Part 1 of 3 - Redacted Medical Records, #3 Exhibit Part 2 of 3 - Redacted Medical Records, #4 Exhibit Part 3 of 3 - Redacted Medical Records)(Piggott, Philip)
August 12, 2019 Filing 24 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Alabama Department of Corrections, Lt. Coleman, Chief Gordon, Lt. Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Brian Coleman, #2 Affidavit Yvette Young, #3 Affidavit Sam Gordon)(Piggott, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by L. Jackson. (Piggott, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nurse Gilcrest. (Piggott, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by David Gams. (Piggott, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nurse Manuel. (Piggott, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Corizon. (Piggott, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Corizon, David Gams, Nurse Gilcrest, L. Jackson, Nurse Manuel.(Piggott, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lt. Coleman. (Piggott, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (cnw, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Lt. Coleman.(Piggott, Philip)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chief Gordon. (Piggott, Philip)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama Department of Corrections. (Piggott, Philip)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lt. Young. (Piggott, Philip)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Correction re #11 Answer to Complaint, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the style of the case. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF docket entry #11 )(cnw, )
July 31, 2019 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Alabama Department of Corrections, Chief Gordon, Lt. Young. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alabama Department of Corrections, Chief Gordon, Lt. Young.(Piggott, Philip) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/31/2019) (cnw, ). Modified on 7/31/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the style of the case (cnw, ). Modified on 7/31/2019 to add the link to the #1 Complaint (cnw, ).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON MOTION denying #9 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/16/2019. (cnw, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Tracey Grissom. (cnw, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT & #5 Order, signed by Kim Singleton for Alabama Department of Corrections, served on 7/8/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (cnw, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT & #5 Order, signed by illegible for Corizon, served on 7/8/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (cnw, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT & #5 Order signed by D. F. for Lt. Coleman, David Gams, Nurse Gilcrest, Chief Gordon, L. Jackson, Nurse Manuel, Lt. Young served on 7/8/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (cnw, )
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before August 14, 2019; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants, General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections and General Counsel for Corizon. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/5/2019. (kh, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Partial Filing fee Received: $ 350.00, receipt number 4602054115. (cnw, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $350 be paid on or before 7/9/2019; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Montgomery Pre-Release Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/19/2019. (furn: cashier) (cnw, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Tracey Grissom. (bes, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Lt. Coleman, Corizon, David Gams, Nurse Gilcrest, Chief Gordon, L. Jackson, Nurse Manuel, Lt. Young, filed by Tracey Grissom. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grissom v. Corizon et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Coleman
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gams
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Young
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Gordon
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Gilcrest
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Jackson
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Manuel
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?