Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Community Action Agency of Central Alabama
Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Defendant: Community Action Agency of Central Alabama
Case Number: 2:2019cv00445
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 File referred to clerk re: #7 request for entry of default (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Entry of Default and Judgment by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation against Community Action Agency of Central Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel Robertson in Support of PBGC's Request for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default)(Robertson, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. Community Action Agency of Central Alabama served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Robertson, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Community Action Agency of Central Alabama and returned to counsel for personal service on defendant. (djy, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation re #1 Complaint. (Robertson, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (djy, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Community Action Agency of Central Alabama, filed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 civil cover sheet)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Community Action Agency of Central Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Ngo
Represented By: Daniel Robertson
Represented By: Melissa T. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Action Agency of Central Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?