T&C Auto Sales v. Washington

Appellee: Latoya D. Washington
Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Appellant: T&C Auto Sales
Case Number: 2:2019cv00447
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #3 Order sent CMRRR to T&C Auto Sales c/o Cedric Grant was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable To Forward." (No pdf attached to this entry) (kr, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the Court that: 1. Appellee's #2 motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction is GRANTED; 2. This appeal is DISMISSED with prejudice; 3. Costs are taxed against the Appellant, for which execution may issue; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/8/2019. (Furn: Bankruptcy Clerk)(kr, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #2 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is GRANTED, and this appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/8/2019. (kr, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Appellant shall show cause as to why the #2 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2019; It is further ORDERED that the Appellee may file a reply to the Appellant's response on or before 8/7/2019 Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/17/2019. (Mailed to Appellant CMRRR & first-class mail)(kr, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Latoya D. Washington. (Milam, Joshua)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT; Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30797-BPC. Appellant Brief due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 USBC Notice of Appeal, #2 USBC Order Denying Motion to Continue, #3 USBC Order Granting Motion for Contempt, #4 USBC Certified Docket Sheet)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T&C Auto Sales v. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Latoya D. Washington
Represented By: Joshua Clinton Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Represented By: Sabrina Lee McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: T&C Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?