Estate of Essie Mae Downing et al v. Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Estate of Essie Mae Downing and Sherri G. Wright
Defendant: Global Life and Accident Insurance Company and Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00456
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Stay Obligations Under Rules 16 and 26 Pending the Resolution of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 8/26/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: the Dft's #4 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Rule 8 FRCP; Plf is GRANTED 21 days to file an amended complaint that addresses the issues discussed at the hearing without further leave of this court; This case is not closed; DIRECTING the parties to file a joint report within 7 days of the filing of the amended complaint regarding the insurance forms discussed at the hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher. Telephone Status Conference held on 8/23/2019 (NO PDF available). (Recording Time 9:30-9:48.) (dh)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Telephone Status Conference for Friday, 8/23/2019, at 09:30 AM before Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher; The parties will be provided with the call-in information by email; It has come to the Court's attention that Plf's counsel has not yet been admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama; Plf's counsel has been notified by both letter and telephone; Prior to the status conference, Plf's counsel is DIRECTED to complete the necessary process to be admitted to practice before this Court. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 8/13/2019. (Copy mailed to Counsel for Plf) (furn: calendar, dh) (wcl, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Rule 26 and Rule 16 Obligations Pending Resolution of #4 Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Pennington, Michael) Modified on 7/18/2019 to include actual title and create link. (dmn, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Pennington, Michael) Modified on 7/2/2019 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Pennington, Michael). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/2/2019 (wcl, ). Modified on 7/2/2019 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Pennington, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(wcl, ) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct the defendant name to reflect as "Globe" and not "Global" (wcl, ).
June 28, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Estate of Essie Mae Downing, Sherri G. Wright. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
June 28, 2019 COMPLAINT against Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed by Estate of Essie Mae Downing, Sherri G. Wright. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct the defendant name to reflect as "Globe" and not "Global" (wcl, ).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Autauga County, Alabama, case number 04-cv-19-900155.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054059) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Jeff Branstetter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt) (wcl, ) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct the defendant name to reflect as "Globe" and not "Global" (wcl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Essie Mae Downing et al v. Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Essie Mae Downing
Represented By: Francis William Speaks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri G. Wright
Represented By: Francis William Speaks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael R. Pennington
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael R. Pennington
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?