Lucy v. Siddiq et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: William N. Lucy
Defendant: Hugh Hood, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Tahir Siddiq, Mrs. Krauel and Patrice Richie
Case Number: 2:2019cv00498
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Hugh Hood, Krauel, Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dr. Tahir Siddiq, #2 Exhibit 1 of 7 - Medical Records, #3 Exhibit 2 of 7 - Medical Records, #4 Exhibit 3 of 7 - Medical Records, #5 Exhibit 4 of 7 - Medical Records, #6 Exhibit 5 of 7 - Medical Records, #7 Exhibit 6 of 7 - Medical Records, #8 Exhibit 7 of 7 - Medical Records)(Piggott, Philip)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Patrice Richie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Warden Patrice Richie)(Piggott, Philip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Krauel. (Piggott, Philip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tahir Siddiq. (Piggott, Philip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hugh Hood. (Piggott, Philip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrice Richie. (Piggott, Philip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. (Piggott, Philip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Patrice Richie.(Piggott, Philip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Hugh Hood, Krauel, Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc..(Piggott, Philip)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order signed by Illegible for Wexford Health Sources, Inc., served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (alm, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order signed by Illegible for Hugh Hood, served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (alm, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Tahir Siddiq, served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (alm, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Mrs. Krauel, served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (alm, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Patrice Richie, served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (alm, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 9/30/2019; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with #1 complaint to the dfts & by regular mail to General Counsel for the ALDOC & Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/20/2019. (alm, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 20.39, receipt number 4602054625. (alm, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time; further ORDERED that the plf be GRANTED an extension from 8/5/2019 to and including 8/15/2019 to file the initial partial filing fee as ordered by this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/26/2019. (alm, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Enlargement of Time filed by William N. Lucy. (alm, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $20.39 be paid on or before 8/5/2019; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/17/2019. (Furn: Cashier) (kr, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by William N. Lucy. (arc, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Hugh Hood, Krauel, Patrice Richie, Tahir Siddiq, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., filed by William N. Lucy.(arc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucy v. Siddiq et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William N. Lucy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Hood
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahir Siddiq
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Krauel
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?