United States of America v. $12,860.00 In United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $12,860.00 In United States Currency
Case Number: 2:2019cv00510
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by United States of America (Declaration of Publication) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Forfeiture Action and Advertisement Certification Report)(Neeley, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Attorney William Clay Teague on 8/28/2019. (wcl, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Teague Law Firm for LaPortia Shadae Webster (@ 160 Stone Park Blvd, Apt 507, Pike Road, AL 36064) on 8/28/2019.(wcl, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Teague Law Firm for Thomas Youngblood (@ 631 East Patton Ave, Apt B, Montgomery, AL 36111) on 8/28/2019.(wcl, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Teague Law Firm for Thomas Youngblood (@ 160 Stone Park Blvd, Apt 507, Pike Road, AL 36064) on 8/28/2019. (wcl, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Unexecuted on 8/16/2019 as to #3 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM and #1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM, for Attorney William Clay Teague. (wcl, ) Modified on 8/16/2019 to reflect as "Unexecuted" (wcl, ).
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Def $12,860.00 In United States Currency c/o US Marshal Service on 7/25/2019. (cnw, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM issued & furnished to USMS for service. (cnw, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (cnw, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $12,860.00 In United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Personal Property, #2 Proposed Warrent of Arrest in Rem, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $12,860.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $12,860.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?