Wood v. Dunn et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Angela M. Wood
Defendant: Greg Lovelace, State of Alabama, Arnaldo Mercado, Jenny Abbott, Kim Thomas, Edward Ellington, Cheryl Price, Gary Malone, Cedric Specks, Steve Watson, Neketris Estelle, Carla Graham, Grantt Culliver, Anthony Brooks, Kevin White and Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 2:2019cv00511
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This Court previously granted Plaintiff's request to participate in the PSAP Program and entered an order giving Plaintiff until September 5, 2019, to file an amended complaint. See Doc. #7 . For good cause, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint is extended to September 19, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/5/2019. (kh, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED and that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to stay service of process so the court may conduct its obligatory review of Plaintiff's complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's request to participate in PSAP (Doc. 5) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before September 5, 2019. PSAP provides assistance from volunteer attorneys in preparing an amended complaint for an unrepresented plaintiff. The volunteer attorney does not ultimately represent the plaintiff but will assist the plaintiff in drafting an amended complaint. Failure to comply with the above deadline may result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. It is further. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/5/2019. (kh, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/23/2019. (kh, )
July 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Angela M. Wood. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of the pro se party by Angela M. Wood. (kh, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATION of the pro se party by Angela M. Wood. (kh, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Angela M. Wood. (kh, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela M. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(kh, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jenny Abbott, Anthony Brooks, Grantt Culliver, Jefferson S. Dunn, Edward Ellington, Neketris Estelle, Carla Graham, Greg Lovelace, Gary Malone, Arnaldo Mercado, Cheryl Price, Cedric Specks, State of Alabama, Kim Thomas, Steve Watson, Kevin White, filed by Angela M. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - The Defendants, #2 Attachment B)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Dunn et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Lovelace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnaldo Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Specks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neketris Estelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?