Brown v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Derric Brown
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc., Steven Pearson, Alexander Santos, Jessie Putnam and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00531
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (djy, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jessie Putnam was returned with the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender", "Not Deliverable As Addressed", "Unable to Forward". Counsel for plaintiff notified service has not been perfected via this electronic notice.(kh, )
August 20, 2019 ***Attorney Charles Andrew Stewart, III for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC added pursuant to #9 answer (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Averitt, Anne)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Averitt, Anne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Alexander Santos was returned with the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender", "Unclaimed", "Unable to Forward". Counsel for plaintiff notified service has not been perfected via this electronic notice.(kh, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Derric Brown as to Lowe's Companies, Inc. was returned with the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender", "Not deliverable as Addressed", "Unable to Forward". Counsel for plaintiff notified service has not been perfected via this electronic notice. (kh, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Steven Pearson was returned with the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender", "Not deliverable as Addressed", "Unable to Forward". Counsel for plaintiff notified service has not been perfected via this electronic notice. (kh, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Kelly Webster for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (kh, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Steven Pearson, Jessie Putnam, Alexander Santos and maailed CMRRR w/ copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement (kh, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Derric Brown (kh, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Derric Brown. (kh, )
July 25, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Derric Brown. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Steven Pearson, Jessie Putnam, Alexander Santos ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054322.), filed by Derric Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Charles Andrew Stewart, III
Represented By: Anne Knox Averitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derric Brown
Represented By: William Post Roberts, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?