The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. Smitherman et al
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: S. L. and Gary Smitherman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00540
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to S. L.; returned to counsel via US Mail for personal service by process server. (cnw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #1 unredacted summons) (cnw, ).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #6 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Summons Under Seal and to Seal Summons Upon Issuance is DENIED to the extent the Plf requests service to be filed under seal. The summons can be redacted to protect the identifiable information of the minor child; therefore, the motion is GRANTED to the extent Plf requests that the minor child's identifiable information be redacted. further ORDERING that Plf shall provide the Clerk of Court both a redacted and unredacted copy of the summons to be issued. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file the redacted copy on the record, and to redact the return receipt card showing service of the complaint and summons. However, if the Plf issues summons via private process server, the Plf is ORDERED to provide the Clerk of Court with both a redacted and unredacted copy of the summons and proof of service. Do not electronically file these documents. Additionally, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to not reflect the address of Defendant S.L., as parent and next-of-friend of Minor Child S.G., on the docket. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/6/2019. (cnw, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Summons Under Seal and to Seal Summons Upon Issuance by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Isenberg, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement #4 Summons signed by Taylor Nix for Gary Smitherman served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (cnw, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gary Smitherman; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint & #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. (cnw, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (cnw, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (cnw, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against S. L., Gary Smitherman ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054350.), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 receipt)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. Smitherman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Smitherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Joel Scott Isenberg
Represented By: Susan Haygood McCurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?