American General Life Insurance Company v. Dawson et al
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Linda Shaw and Barbara Dawson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00542
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Barbara Dawson; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Alias Summons issued as to Linda Shaw & returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by American General Life Insurance Company. (Gamble, Forrest) Modified on 9/9/2019 to remove the link to the #9 notice as the notice was not issued as to this party (wcl, ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Barbara Dawson; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Barbara Dawson. (wcl, )
September 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Linda Shaw by Barbara Dawson.(Phillips, Clay)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Linda Shaw with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to Forward". (alm, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Barbara Dawson for Barbara Dawson served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (wcl, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Barbara Dawson & Linda Shaw; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for American General Life Insurance Company. (alm, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (alm, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER RELIEF against Barbara Dawson, Linda Shaw (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602054365), filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Filing Fee Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American General Life Insurance Company v. Dawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Melcher
Represented By: Forrest Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Dawson
Represented By: Clay M Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?