Turner v. Price et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Cleveland Turner
Defendant: Charles Daniels and Cheryl Price
Case Number: 2:2019cv00587
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the prior proceedings, opinions, and orders of the court, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that Plaintiff's federal-law claim are DISMISSED with prejudice and that Plaintiff's state-law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 USC 1367(c)(3); The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(kr, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The #5 Recommendation is ADOPTED; (2) Plaintiff's claims alleging violations of his constitutional rights are DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii); and (3) Plaintiff's supplemental state-law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice to any right Plaintiff may have to proceed on these claims before the state courts, see 28 USC 1367(c)(3). Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/26/2019. (kr, )
September 24, 2019 No objections filed to the #5 Recommendation. (no pdf document attached to this entry). (kh, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. The plaintiff's claims alleging violations of his constitutional rights be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). 2. The plaintiff's supplemental state law claims be dismissed without prejudice to any right the plaintiff may have to proceed on these claims before the state courts. 3. This 42 U.S.C. 1983 action be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/30/2019.(kh, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/15/2019. (Furn: Cashier) (kr, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's pro se motions for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. #1 ) are DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/15/2019. (kr, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Cleveland Turner. (bes, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Charles Daniels, Cheryl Price, filed by Cleveland Turner.(bes, )
August 14, 2019 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Cleveland Turner. (No PDF Attached - See Docket Entry #1 ) (bes, )
August 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cleveland Turner. (No PDF Attached - See Docket Entry #1 ) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Price et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?