Grooms v. Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Corey Grooms
Defendant: Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC and Christopher Railey
Case Number: 2:2019cv00597
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral judge. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kr, )
October 4, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Susan Russ Walker: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Strike Jury Demand, #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (No pdf attached to this entry) (kr, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Corey Grooms. (Hudson, Charles)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are hereby reminded that each has the right to consent or request reassignment. The parties should now confirm their choice in writing. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before October 4, 2019. In the absence of consent forms received from all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign this case randomly to a district judge. Note: CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/27/2019. (kh, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Objection to Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Remand filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Christopher Railey. (Scroggins, Thomas) Modified on 9/26/2019 to create link to motion (kr, ).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court on plaintiff's motion to remand. Doc. #4 . The removing party shall respond on or before September 24, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/4/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry)(kr, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Corey Grooms re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hudson, Charles) Modified on 9/4/2019 to add the link to the #6 Notice (kr, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Railey re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Nixon, Brooke) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/4/2019) (kr, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC re #5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Nixon, Brooke) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/4/2019) (kr, ).
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Corey Grooms; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(kr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Christopher Railey; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(kr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Corey Grooms. (Hudson, Charles)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Christopher Railey. (Scroggins, Thomas). Added MOTION to Strike Jury Demand on 8/28/2019 (kr, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES - Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Corey Grooms, Christopher Railey. (kr, )
August 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Corey Grooms. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (kr, )
August 19, 2019 COMPLAINT against Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Christopher Railey, filed by Corey Grooms. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf)(kr, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Christopher Railey from Circuit Court of Bullock County, Alabama, case number 09-cv-2019-00054.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054631) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grooms v. Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Grooms
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Wendall Scroggins
Represented By: Brooke Milstead Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Railey
Represented By: Thomas Wendall Scroggins
Represented By: Brooke Milstead Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?