Richburg v. State of Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Randy Jerome Richburg
Defendant: Cpt. McCee, State of Alabama Department of Corrections, Cpt. Howard and Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 2:2019cv00598
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
2 Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order signed by Kristi Simpson for Jefferson S. Dunn, served on 10/10/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (amf, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by Wanda Andrews for Cpt. Howard served on 10/9/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (djy, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 11/18/2019; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with complaint and any attachments to this pleading to Dfts Howard and Dunn, ALDOC General Counsel, and the Alabama Attorney General. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/7/2019. (wcl, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Limestone CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/4/2019. (Furnished: Cashier) (amf, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from the Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 1:19-cv-1035-LCB-JEO; Original file, certified copy of transfer order, & certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (alm, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, entered in ND/AL, that the magistrate judge's #3 report and recommendation is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED and the plaintiff's motion is GRANTED; the court ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United State District Court for the Middle District of Alabama; original electronic record and certified copy of docket sheet will be electronically sent to the Clerk of Court 10 business days form this date. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/7/2019. (alm, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, filed in ND/AL, that the magistrate judge RECOMMENDS that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama; Objections to the R&R are due within 14 days from the date the R&R is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/15/2019. (alm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, filed in ND/AL, by Randy Jerome Richburg. (alm, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT, filed in ND/AL, against Jefferson S. Dunn, Cpt. Howard, Cpt. McCee, State of Alabama Department of Corrections, filed by Randy Jerome Richburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Formal Complaint)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richburg v. State of Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. McCee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Jerome Richburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?