Faircloth v. Wal-Mart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vicki Faircloth
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00608
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Wal-Mart, Inc. on 8/30/2019 by Vicki Faircloth; Waiver of Service due by 9/30/2019. (Whatley, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Vicki Faircloth re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Whatley, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Vicki Faircloth; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Vicki Faircloth. (alm, )
August 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Vicki Faircloth. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (alm, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602054665) filed by Vicki Faircloth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faircloth v. Wal-Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Faircloth
Represented By: David Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?