Ledbetter v. Alabama Board of Pardons and Parole et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: James A. Ledbetter
Defendant: Lyn Head, Eddie Cook and Alabama Board of Pardons and Parole
Case Number: 2:2019cv00641
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order of the court entered in this case on this day adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Final Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants, and against Plaintiff, and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(kh, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. 1983 claims against Defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); 2. This case is DISMISSED prior to service of process. A Final Judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/31/2019.(kh, )
October 28, 2019 No objections filed to the #6 Recommendation. (kh, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice prior to service under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as Plaintiff's claims provide no basis for relief at this time. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/1/2019. (kh, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/26/2019. (furn: cashier, acct clerk)(kh, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James A. Ledbetter. (kh, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that: 1. On or before September 25, 2019, Plaintiff shall submit an inmate account statement reflecting the average monthly balance in his prison account and the average monthly deposits to his account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the instant complaint. Plaintiff is cautioned that his failure to comply with this Order will result in a Recommendation by the undersigned that this case be dismissed; and 2. The Clerk of Court SEND a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Bullock Correctional Facility. Plaintiff shall immediately inform the court and Defendants or Defendants' counsel of record of any change in his address. Failure to provide a correct address to this court within ten (10) days following any change of address will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/11/2019. (furn: acct clerk)(kh, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James A. Ledbetter. (bes, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Board of Pardons and Parole, Eddie Cook, Lyn Head, filed by James A. Ledbetter.(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledbetter v. Alabama Board of Pardons and Parole et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyn Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Board of Pardons and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?