Perrine v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: Audrey W. Perrine
Defendant: John R. Cooper and Steven C. Graben
Case Number: 2:2019cv00652
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/12/2019. (wcl, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Process Server by Audrey W. Perrine. (Clemon, U.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Audrey W. Perrine re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Clemon, U.) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/12/2019) (wcl, ). Modified on 9/12/2019 to attach a properly published PDF document (wcl, ). Modified on 9/27/2019 to add the link to the #3 notice (wcl, ).
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Audrey W. Perrine; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Audrey W. Perrine. (wcl, )
September 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Audrey W. Perrine. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John R. Cooper, Steven C. Graben (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054867.), filed by Audrey W. Perrine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrine v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey W. Perrine
Represented By: U. W. Clemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. Graben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?