Roe v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Leslie Gaye Roe
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00663
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint signed by Emily Sase for US Attorney General served on 9/18/2019. (kr, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Leslie Gaye Roe re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Baxley, William)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Leslie Gaye Roe; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #2 Summons signed by illegible for United States of America served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (cnw, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (kr, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054895.), filed by Leslie Gaye Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Gaye Roe
Represented By: William Joseph Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?