Cobble v. All Georgia Supreme Judges et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Daniel Eric Cobble and Daniel Castleberry
Defendant: US District North Georgia, US Magistrate North Georgia, US Magistrate Chattanooga, US District Middle Georgia, All Georgia Supreme Judges, US District Chattanooga and US Magistrate Middle Georgia
Case Number: 2:2019cv00666
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 (Notice of Objection Evidence) OBJECTION to #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Daniel Eric Cobble. (wcl, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Daniel Eric Cobble. (wcl, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) Cobble's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED; and (2) This case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Cobble's failure to pay the filing and administrative fees upon initiating the case; Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/28/2019. (wcl, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Daniel Eric Cobble. (bes, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Bivens Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against All Georgia Supreme Judges, US District Middle Georgia, US District North Georgia, US Magistrate Chattanooga, US Magistrate Middle Georgia, US Magistrate North Georgia, US District Chattanooga, filed by Daniel Eric Cobble.(bes, ) Modified on 9/12/2019 to correct the docket text to reflect US District Chattanooga as a defendant (wcl, ).
September 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel Eric Cobble. (No PDF Attached - See Docket Entry #1 ) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobble v. All Georgia Supreme Judges et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Eric Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Castleberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US District North Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Magistrate North Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Magistrate Chattanooga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US District Middle Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Georgia Supreme Judges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US District Chattanooga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Magistrate Middle Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?