Barr v. Alston et al
Plaintiff: Barry D. Barr
Defendant: James A. Alston, Kristen Thrasher-Barr and Kristen Barr-Thrasher
Case Number: 2:2019cv00698
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeff Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
2 Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Barry D. Barr re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McDermott, Mickey) Modified on 10/11/2019 to add the link to the #10 notice (wcl, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Barry D. Barr; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by James A. Alston. (Mosholder, Brian)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James A. Alston re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Mosholder, Brian)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction re #5 Objection & #6 Response and Opposition, to attach corrected PDF documents to reflect the proper dates on the pleadings and on the certificates of service as 10/4/2019 & not 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #5 , #2 Main PDF to Document #6 )(amf, )
October 4, 2019 OBJECTION to Federal Jurisdiction Request for Removal to the Trial Court in the Circuit Court of Montgomery, Alabama filed by Barry D. Barr. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #5 for PDF) (amf, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE and Opposition re #1 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Barry D. Barr. (McDermott, Mickey) Modified on 10/4/2019 to clarify the docket text to reflect this entry as a "response" and not an "objection" (amf, ). (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/7/2019 to attach corrected PDF documents to reflect the proper dates on the pleadings and on the certificates of service as 10/4/2019 & not 10/3/2019) (amf, ). Modified on 10/7/2019 (amf, ).
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 (OBJECTION) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 Notice of Removal, by Barry D. Barr. (McDermott, Mickey) Modified on 10/4/2019 to clarify the docket text to reflect this entry as an "objection" and not a "response" (amf, ). (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/7/2019 to attach corrected PDF documents to reflect the proper dates on the pleadings and on the certificates of service as 10/4/2019 & not 10/3/2019) (amf, ). Modified on 10/7/2019 (amf, ).
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Jeff Beaverstock as Presiding Judge; Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case. (amf, ) (amf, ).
October 1, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to James A. Alston; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by James A. Alston. (Mosholder, Brian)
September 19, 2019 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against James A. Alston, Kristen Barr-Thrasher, filed by Barry D. Barr. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 -2 for PDF)(amf, )
September 19, 2019 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 -3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James A. Alston. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 -5 for PDF) (amf, )
September 19, 2019 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 -3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barry D. Barr. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 -4 for PDF) (amf, )
September 19, 2019 MOTION to Dismiss by James A. Alston. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 -3 for PDF) (amf, )
September 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Barry D. Barr. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 -1 for PDF) (amf, )
September 19, 2019 COMPLAINT against James A. Alston, Kristen Barr-Thrasher, filed by Barry D. Barr. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 -1 for PDF) (amf, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James A. Alston from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2019-900963.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602054989) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Amended State Court Complaint, #3 Motion to Dismiss, #4 Response and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss, #6 State Court Record, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Filing Fee Receipt), #9 Notice of Notice of Removal (amf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2019: #9 Notice of Notice of Removal) (amf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barr v. Alston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Alston
Represented By: Brian Taggart Mosholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Thrasher-Barr
Represented By: Robert Jackson Russell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Barr-Thrasher
Represented By: Robert Jackson Russell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry D. Barr
Represented By: Mickey JG McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?