Griffith et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Allen Griffith and Bessie Griffith
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Shepherd A. Odom, M.D., P.C., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Gilberto Sanchez, M.D., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00723
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Received email from Northern District of Ohio regarding receipt of e-transfer case; Northern District of Ohio case number assigned as 1:19-op-45921. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 21, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to the Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 10/16/2019 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (cnw, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Based upon the conditional transfer order, which was finalized on October 16, 2019, it is ORDERED that the joint motion to stay (Doc. #7 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/17/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Error re #9 Notice of Appearance, which is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous docket entry. Counsel e-filed her notice of appearance under co-counsel's login instead of her own. (cnw, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Summer Austin Wells on behalf of Bessie Griffith, Ralph Allen Griffith (Wells, Summer)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Walker, Thomas) Modified on 10/16/2019 to clarify as satisfying #5 deficiency notice (cnw, ).
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 (STRICKEN as an erroneous docket entry) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr on behalf of Bessie Griffith, Ralph Allen Griffith (Brooks, Gerald) Modified on 10/17/2019 (cnw, ).
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cnw, )
October 4, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Doyle: #7 Joint MOTION to Stay to Allow Transfer to the Multi-District Litigation Proceeding. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay to Allow Transfer to the Multi-District Litigation Proceeding by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Porter, Maibeth)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Porter, Maibeth)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PLFS & 2 DEFS) Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Bessie Griffith, Ralph Allen Griffith, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (cnw, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 (Consent to Removal) JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal, by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (cnw, )
September 27, 2019 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
September 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bessie Griffith, Ralph Allen Griffith. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
September 27, 2019 COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Gilberto Sanchez, M.D., Inc., Shepherd A. Odom, M.D., P.C., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., filed by Ralph Allen Griffith, Bessie Griffith. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cnw, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-cv-19-901624.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055065) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 - State Court Record, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 - Consent to removal, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 receipt)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Maibeth Jernigan Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shepherd A. Odom, M.D., P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Edward Walker
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Sanchez, M.D., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Allen Griffith
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr.
Represented By: Charles James, II
Represented By: Summer Austin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Griffith
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr.
Represented By: Charles James, II
Represented By: Summer Austin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?