McDougald v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Angela McDougald and Angela T. McDougald
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00785
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order)(Thomas, Donald
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER, for any motions to remand, motions to dismiss, motions for judgment on the pleadings, motions for summary judgment, and Daubert motions filed in this case, setting briefing schedule, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/10/19. (djy, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the request for entry of a stipulated protective order (Doc. #12 - 1) is DENIED with leave to refile. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/9/2019. (amf, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2021, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2020; Discovery due by 8/18/2020; Mediation Notice due by 8/23/2020; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 9/17/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/9/2019. (Furnished: Calendar & WR) (amf, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Parker Davis on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Davis, Elizabeth)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John Isaac Southerland on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Southerland, John)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas, Donald)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Angela T. McDougald. (Wright, Richard)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(F) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/26/2019; directing counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 11/22/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/18/19. (djy, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Angela T. McDougald; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Ford Motor Company. (djy, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company re #5 Answer to Complaint. (Thomas, Donald)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Thomas, Donald)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Ford Motor Company served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (djy, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Angela T. McDougald. (djy, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
October 15, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Angela T. McDougald. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055293.), filed by Angela T. McDougald. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDougald v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Donald Alan Thomas
Represented By: John Isaac Southerland
Represented By: Elizabeth Parker Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela McDougald
Represented By: James Michael Perry
Represented By: Richard Allen Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela T. McDougald
Represented By: James Michael Perry
Represented By: Richard Allen Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?